EP0757117 - Method and apparatus for deposition of material on a semiconductor wafer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.05.2000 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.05.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.06.2000 [2000/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MEMC Electronic Materials, Inc. 501 Pearl Drive, P.O. Box 8 St. Peters Missouri 63376 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1997/06] | For all designated states MEMC Electronic Materials, Inc. 501 Pearl Drive P.O. Box 8 St. Peters, Missouri 63376 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Glaenzer, Richard H. 501 Pearl Drive, P.O. Box 8 St. Peters, Missouri 63376 / US | [1997/06] | Representative(s) | Eyles, Christopher Thomas W.P. Thompson & Co. 55 Drury Lane London WC2B 5SQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/06] | Eyles, Christopher Thomas W.P. THOMPSON & CO. Celcon House 289-293 High Holborn London WC1V 7HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 95305392.3 | 01.08.1995 | [1997/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0757117 | Date: | 05.02.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0757117 | Date: | 07.07.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.01.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C23C16/44, C30B25/14 | [1997/06] | CPC: |
C30B25/14 (EP);
C23C16/455 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1997/06] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Materialabscheidung auf einer Halbleiterscheibe | [1997/06] | English: | Method and apparatus for deposition of material on a semiconductor wafer | [1997/06] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour le dépôt de matière sur une plaquette semi-conductrice | [1997/06] | Examination procedure | 14.08.1996 | Examination requested [1997/06] | 22.01.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 29.05.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 16.12.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.01.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 16.01.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.04.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.08.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US4928626 (CARLSON DAVID K [US], et al) [X] 7 * column 3, line 15 - column 4, line 36 * [A] 1-6,8-10; | [A]EP0305195 (TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INC [US]) [A] 1-10 * claims 1-4 *; | [A]DE1913676 (SIEMENS AG) [A] 1-10 * claim 1 * |