EP0702171 - Tandem type hydraulic clutch system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.09.1999 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.09.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.10.1999 [1999/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HONDA GIKEN KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1-1, Minami-Aoyama 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1996/12] | For all designated states HONDA GIKEN KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1-1, 2-chome Minami-Aoyama Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kojima, Yoichi, c/o Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho 3-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi, Saitama / JP | 02 /
Kodama, Yoshihiro, c/o Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho 3-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi, Saitama / JP | [1996/12] | Representative(s) | Leale, Robin George Frank B. Dehn & Co.,European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/12] | Leale, Robin George FRANK B. DEHN & CO. Imperial House 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 95305731.2 | 17.08.1995 | [1996/12] | Priority number, date | JP19940195186 | 19.08.1994 Original published format: JP 19518694 | [1996/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0702171 | Date: | 20.03.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0702171 | Date: | 04.11.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.01.1996 | Classification | IPC: | F16H63/30, F16D25/10 | [1996/12] | CPC: |
F16H57/0434 (EP,US);
F16D21/06 (US);
F16D25/0638 (EP,US);
F16D25/10 (EP);
F16H63/3026 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1996/12] | Title | German: | Hydraulisches Tandem-Kupplungs-System | [1996/12] | English: | Tandem type hydraulic clutch system | [1996/12] | French: | Système d'embrayage hydraulique de type tandem | [1996/12] | Examination procedure | 04.03.1996 | Examination requested [1996/18] | 25.11.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.07.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 17.09.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.01.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.05.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.07.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 23.07.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.08.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/43] | Request for further processing for: | 17.09.1997 | Request for further processing filed | 17.09.1997 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 14.10.1997 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.08.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]DE1160308 (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]) [X] 1,5 * figure 1 * [A] 2,3,5,6; | [A]DE1550778 (GEN MOTORS CORP); | [XA]DE6910124U (PORSCHE KG [DE]) [X] 1,5 * figure . * [A] 2,3,6,7; | [XA]DE2215165 (NISSAN MOTOR) [X] 1 * figure 1 * [A] 3,7; | [A]DE3838865 (LUK LAMELLEN & KUPPLUNGSBAU [DE]) [A] 1-3,5-7 * figure 1 *; | [PA]WO9503497 (ZAHNRADFABRIK FRIEDRICHSHAFEN [DE], et al) [PA] 1,4,5,8 * abstract * | by applicant | JPH02125164 |