EP0715273 - Code symbol reading system and method for reading these code symbols, e.g. bar code symbols [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.10.2002 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 06.02.2008 [2008/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states METROLOGIC INSTRUMENTS, INC. Coles Road at Route 42 Blackwood, NJ 08012 / US | [1996/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rockstein, George B. 210 Princeton Road Audubon, New Jersey 08106 / US | 02 /
Wilz, David M. 10 Orion Way Sewell, New Jersey 08080 / US | 03 /
Colavito, Stephen J. 3520 Edgewater Lane Brookhaven, PA 19105 / US | 04 /
German, Gene 302 Osprey Lane Voorhees, New Jersey 08043 / US | 05 /
Knowles, Carl H. 425 East Linden Street Morestown, New Jersey 08057 / US | [1996/23] | Representative(s) | Whitten, George Alan, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/23] | Whitten, George Alan, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co., 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 95305748.6 | 17.08.1995 | [1996/23] | Priority number, date | US19940292237 | 17.08.1994 Original published format: US 292237 | [1996/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0715273 | Date: | 05.06.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/23] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0715273 | Date: | 24.07.1996 | [1996/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0715273 | Date: | 19.12.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.06.1996 | Classification | IPC: | G06K7/10 | [1996/23] | CPC: |
G06K7/10871 (EP,US);
G02B26/106 (EP,US);
G06K17/0022 (EP,US);
G06K7/10 (EP,US);
G06K7/10564 (EP,US);
G06K7/10584 (EP,US);
G06K7/10594 (EP,US);
G06K7/10603 (EP,US);
G06K7/10663 (EP,US);
G06K7/10673 (EP,US);
G06K7/10693 (EP,US);
G06K7/10702 (EP,US);
G06K7/10792 (EP,US);
G06K7/10801 (EP,US);
G06K7/10811 (EP,US);
G06K7/10851 (EP,US);
G06K7/10861 (EP,US);
G06K7/10881 (EP,US);
G06K7/10891 (EP,US);
G06K7/109 (EP,US);
G06K7/14 (EP,US);
G06K7/1443 (EP,US);
G06K2007/10534 (EP,US);
G06K2207/1012 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1996/23] | Title | German: | System und Verfahren zum Lesen von codierten Zeichen z.B. Barcodezeichen | [1996/23] | English: | Code symbol reading system and method for reading these code symbols, e.g. bar code symbols | [1996/23] | French: | Système et procédé pour lire des symbols codées par exemple de code à bâtonnets | [1996/23] | Examination procedure | 20.12.1996 | Examination requested [1997/09] | 18.05.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.01.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 20.01.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.12.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.06.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.09.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 20.09.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.09.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/50] | Request for further processing for: | 20.01.2000 | Request for further processing filed | 20.01.2000 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 10.02.2000 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.08.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 19.12.2001 | BE | 19.12.2001 | CH | 19.12.2001 | GR | 19.12.2001 | IT | 19.12.2001 | LI | 19.12.2001 | NL | 19.12.2001 | DK | 19.03.2002 | PT | 19.03.2002 | SE | 19.03.2002 | ES | 27.06.2002 | LU | 17.08.2002 | IE | 19.08.2002 | [2008/06] |
Former [2004/39] | AT | 19.12.2001 | |
BE | 19.12.2001 | ||
CH | 19.12.2001 | ||
GR | 19.12.2001 | ||
LI | 19.12.2001 | ||
NL | 19.12.2001 | ||
DK | 19.03.2002 | ||
PT | 19.03.2002 | ||
SE | 19.03.2002 | ||
ES | 27.06.2002 | ||
LU | 17.08.2002 | ||
IE | 19.08.2002 | ||
Former [2004/04] | AT | 19.12.2001 | |
BE | 19.12.2001 | ||
CH | 19.12.2001 | ||
GR | 19.12.2001 | ||
LI | 19.12.2001 | ||
NL | 19.12.2001 | ||
DK | 19.03.2002 | ||
PT | 19.03.2002 | ||
SE | 19.03.2002 | ||
ES | 27.06.2002 | ||
IE | 19.08.2002 | ||
Former [2003/45] | AT | 19.12.2001 | |
BE | 19.12.2001 | ||
CH | 19.12.2001 | ||
GR | 19.12.2001 | ||
LI | 19.12.2001 | ||
NL | 19.12.2001 | ||
DK | 19.03.2002 | ||
PT | 19.03.2002 | ||
SE | 19.03.2002 | ||
IE | 19.08.2002 | ||
Former [2003/42] | AT | 19.12.2001 | |
BE | 19.12.2001 | ||
CH | 19.12.2001 | ||
GR | 19.12.2001 | ||
LI | 19.12.2001 | ||
NL | 19.12.2001 | ||
PT | 19.03.2002 | ||
SE | 19.03.2002 | ||
IE | 19.08.2002 | ||
Former [2003/09] | AT | 19.12.2001 | |
BE | 19.12.2001 | ||
CH | 19.12.2001 | ||
GR | 19.12.2001 | ||
LI | 19.12.2001 | ||
NL | 19.12.2001 | ||
PT | 19.03.2002 | ||
SE | 19.03.2002 | ||
Former [2003/06] | BE | 19.12.2001 | |
CH | 19.12.2001 | ||
GR | 19.12.2001 | ||
LI | 19.12.2001 | ||
NL | 19.12.2001 | ||
PT | 19.03.2002 | ||
SE | 19.03.2002 | ||
Former [2003/01] | CH | 19.12.2001 | |
GR | 19.12.2001 | ||
LI | 19.12.2001 | ||
PT | 19.03.2002 | ||
SE | 19.03.2002 | ||
Former [2002/49] | GR | 19.12.2001 | |
PT | 19.03.2002 | ||
SE | 19.03.2002 | ||
Former [2002/48] | PT | 19.03.2002 | |
SE | 19.03.2002 | ||
Former [2002/26] | SE | 19.03.2002 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO9006633 (DALLAS SEMICONDUCTOR [US]) [Y] 1,3,4,20,22; | [A]US4945216 (TANABE TAKESHI [JP], et al) [A] 1,20,22; | [A]EP0479297 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO [JP]) [A] 1,20,22; | [Y]WO9402910 (TELXON CORP [US]) [Y] 1,3,4,20,22; | [A]EP0600374 (TEXAS INSTRUMENTS DEUTSCHLAND [DE])[A] 1,20,22 | Examination | WO9306565 | US5260553 | by applicant | US4387297 | US4418277 | US4575625 | US4639606 | US4684930 | US4751500 | US4825057 | US4845349 | US4870391 | US4903848 | US4933538 | US5047617 | US5080456 | US5107100 | US5157687 | US19910761123 |