EP0698690 - A shoreline erosion control structure [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.10.1999 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.10.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.11.1999 [1999/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NG, Siew Chor A/L NG Yuen No. 50A, Main Road, Kepong 52100 Kuala Lumpur / MY | [1996/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1996/09] | Representative(s) | Pidgeon, Robert John, et al Appleyard Lees 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/14] | Pidgeon, Robert John, et al Appleyard Lees 15 Clare Road Halifax West Yorkshire HX1 2HY / GB | ||
Former [1996/09] | Day, Jeremy John Silvermere, Cottimore Terrace Walton-on-Thames, Surrey, KT12 2BY / GB | Application number, filing date | 95305987.0 | 25.08.1995 | [1996/09] | Priority number, date | MY19940002236 | 26.08.1994 Original published format: MY 9402236 | MY19940002237 | 26.08.1994 Original published format: MY 9402237 | [1996/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0698690 | Date: | 28.02.1996 | [1996/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.12.1995 | Classification | IPC: | E02B3/06 | [1996/09] | CPC: |
E02B3/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, DK, FR, GB, NL, SE [1996/09] | Title | German: | Ufererosionschutzkonstruktion | [1996/09] | English: | A shoreline erosion control structure | [1996/09] | French: | Construction de contrôle de l'érosion d'une côte maritime | [1996/09] | Examination procedure | 21.08.1996 | Examination requested [1996/42] | 16.01.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.07.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.02.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.11.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.03.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1999/46] | 09.04.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1999/46] | Request for further processing for: | 27.11.1998 | Request for further processing filed | 27.11.1998 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 17.12.1998 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.08.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.1998 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US1971324 (CARL WEBER) [X] 1-4,9-11 * page 1, line 93 - page 2, line 45; figure - * [Y] 5-8,12,13; | [Y]US2941371 (BENEDICT LOUIS K, et al) [Y] 5-8 * column 1, line 19 - line 25 * * column 1, line 49 - line 64; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US3869868 (IRSAI EUGENE) [A] 1,11,12* figure - *; | [X]FR2334789 (MONCADE NOEL [FR]) [X] 1-3,9-13 * the whole document *; | [A]US4362432 (CONOVER MARIA T) [A] 1,5 * column A; figure - *; | [X]US4776725 (BRADE DONALD E [US]) [X] 1 * column A; figure - *; | [Y]WO9008230 (ATKINSON FRANCIS [US], et al) [Y] 12,13 * page 20, line 4 - page 21, line 5; figure - * | by applicant | US3386250 | US5160215 | US5178489 |