EP0711536 - Urine collection device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.07.1997 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.08.1997 [1997/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cawood, Charles David 11527 North Lou Al Court Houston, TX 77030 / US | [1996/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1996/20] | Representative(s) | Kensett, John Hinton Saunders & Dolleymore LLP 9 Rickmansworth Road Watford WD18 0JU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/20] | Kensett, John Hinton Saunders & Dolleymore, 9 Rickmansworth Road Watford, Hertfordshire WD1 7HE / GB | Application number, filing date | 95306084.5 | 31.08.1995 | [1996/20] | Priority number, date | JP19940279270 | 14.11.1994 Original published format: JP 27927094 | [1996/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0711536 | Date: | 15.05.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.03.1996 | Classification | IPC: | A61F5/44 | [1996/20] | CPC: |
A61F5/4408 (EP);
A61F5/44 (EP);
A61F5/4404 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1996/20] | Title | German: | Urinsammelvorrichtung | [1996/20] | English: | Urine collection device | [1996/20] | French: | Dispositif collecteur d'urine | [1996/20] | File destroyed: | 13.09.2003 | Examination procedure | 16.11.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1997/34] | 25.03.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1997/34] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB2215211 (SMITHS INDUSTRIES PLC [GB]) [X] 1-7 * page 5, line 1 - page 6, line 7; figures 1-3 *; | [XY]US4449971 (CAWOOD CHARLES D [US]) [X] 1,5-8 * the whole document * [Y] 2-4; | [Y]WO9100074 (NILSSON LEIF [SE]) [Y] 2-4 * page 11, line 19 - line 30; figure 3 *; | [A]EP0127474 (COLOPLAST AS [DK]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]GB2080116 (CRAIG MED PROD LTD) [A] 1 * page 1, line 50 - line 77; figure - *; | [A]DE8709793U (BOEMINGHAUS) [A] 1 * figure -; claim 1 * | by applicant | US3987785 |