EP0761476 - Wheel disk having a non-uniform thickness [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.07.1999 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.07.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.09.1999 [1999/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOPY KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 9, 5-banchi, Yonban-cho, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 102 / JP | [1997/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Abe, Kishiro, c/o Topy Kogyo K.K. 9, 5-banchi Yonban-cho, Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 102 / JP | 02 /
Itoh, Mitsuru, c/o Topy Kogyo K.K. 9, 5-banchi Yonban-cho, Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 102 / JP | [1997/11] | Representative(s) | Paget, Hugh Charles Edward, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/11] | Paget, Hugh Charles Edward, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 95306236.1 | 06.09.1995 | [1997/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0761476 | Date: | 12.03.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.02.1996 | Classification | IPC: | B60B3/04, B21D53/26 | [1997/11] | CPC: |
B60B3/005 (EP,US);
B21D53/26 (EP,US);
B60B3/044 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49501 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [1997/11] | Title | German: | Radscheibe mit nicht gleichmässiger Dicke | [1997/11] | English: | Wheel disk having a non-uniform thickness | [1997/11] | French: | Disque de zone à épaisseur non uniforme | [1997/11] | Examination procedure | 25.09.1995 | Examination requested [1997/11] | 16.10.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.10.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.11.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.03.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1999/37] | 21.04.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1999/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE2301760 (SUEDRAD GMBH) [X] 1,4,5 * page 1 - page 3; figure - *; | [A]JPS5930437 ; | [A]US3823591 (SCHRODER P, et al) [A] 1,7 * column 6, line 10 - line 67; figure - *; | [A]DE1964393 (MICHELIN & CIE) [A] 1 * page 7 - page 8; figure - *; | [A]DE2026838 (SÜDRAD) [A] 1 * page 2, line 18 - line 34; figure . *; | [A]GB2025333 (MICHELIN & CIE) [A] 1 * page 1 - page 3; figure . * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19840614), vol. 8, no. 128, Database accession no. (M - 302), & JP59030437 A 19840218 (KOBE SEIKOSHO KK) [A] 6-8 * abstract * |