EP0712138 - Arrangements for transferring energy in fission product isotope production reactors [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.03.1999 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.03.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.05.1999 [1999/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BWX Technologies, Inc. State Road 726 Mt. Athos Lynchburg, Virginia 24505 / US | [1999/15] |
Former [1996/20] | For all designated states THE BABCOCK & WILCOX COMPANY P.O. Box 60035, 1450 Poydras Street New Orleans, Louisiana 70160-0035 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ball, Russell M. 1620 Belfield Place Lynchburg, Virginia 24503 / US | 02 /
Bingham, Billy E. 110 Old Wiggington Road Lynchburg, Virginia 24502 / US | [1996/20] | Representative(s) | Pilch, Adam John Michael D Young & Co 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/20] | Pilch, Adam John Michael D. YOUNG & CO., 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 95306317.9 | 08.09.1995 | [1996/20] | Priority number, date | US19940339250 | 10.11.1994 Original published format: US 339250 | [1996/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0712138 | Date: | 15.05.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0712138 | Date: | 20.05.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.01.1996 | Classification | IPC: | G21C1/22, G21C1/30 | [1996/20] | CPC: |
G21C1/22 (EP);
G21C1/303 (EP);
Y02E30/30 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, FR, NL [1996/20] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Energieübertragung in einem zur Erzeugung von Isotopen als Spaltprodukt ausgelegten Reaktor | [1996/20] | English: | Arrangements for transferring energy in fission product isotope production reactors | [1996/20] | French: | Dispositif de transfert d'énergie dans un réacteur de production d'isotopes comme produits de fission | [1996/20] | Examination procedure | 09.10.1996 | Examination requested [1996/49] | 29.09.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.11.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.01.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 20.01.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.02.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.08.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR1588391 (EURATOM) [A] 1,3,8 * page 3, lines 1-30; figure *; | [A]US3284305 (UREY HAROLD C, et al) [A] 1,3,8 * column 1, line 39 - column 2, line 19; figures 1-2 *; | [A]US4563327 (MINKOV VLADIMIR [US]) [A] 1,3,8 * column A; figures 1-2 *; | [A]BE526793 (RUTGERS) [A] 1,8,9 * page 3, lines 22-32; figures *; | [DA]US4487738 (O'BRIEN JR HAROLD A [US], et al) [DA] 1 * column A *; | [DA]FR2214509 (ATOMIC ENERGY COMMISSION [US]) [DA] 1 * the whole document *; | [DA]US4158700 (KARAGEOZIAN HAMPAR L) [DA] 1 * column A *; | [DA]CA2098560 (BABCOCK & WILCOX CO [US]) [DA] 1 * abstract * | [DA] - W. L. CHENG, "Study on the Separation of Molybdenum-99 and Recycling of Uranium to Water Boiler Reactor", APPL. RADIAT. ISOT., GREAT BRITAIN, (1989), vol. 40, no. 4, pages 315 - 324, XP000560947 [DA] 1 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0883-2889(89)90224-4 |