EP0704361 - Perforate diaphragm alignment system for spring brake actuators [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.01.2000 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.01.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.03.2000 [2000/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INDIAN HEAD INDUSTRIES, INC. 8530 Cliff Cameron Drive Charlotte, NC 28269 / US | [1996/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Plantan, Ronald S. 10313 Thomas Payne Circle Charlotte, North Carolina 28277 / US | [1996/14] | Representative(s) | Moreland, David, et al Marks & Clerk LLP The Beacon 176 St Vincent Street Glasgow G2 5SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/35] | Moreland, David, Dr., et al Cruikshank & Fairweather, 19 Royal Exchange Square Glasgow G1 3AE / GB | ||
Former [1996/14] | Jones, Andrée Zena, et al CRUIKSHANK & FAIRWEATHER 19 Royal Exchange Square Glasgow, G1 3AE Scotland / GB | Application number, filing date | 95306402.9 | 13.09.1995 | [1996/14] | Priority number, date | US19940316513 | 30.09.1994 Original published format: US 316513 | [1996/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0704361 | Date: | 03.04.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0704361 | Date: | 17.03.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.01.1996 | Classification | IPC: | B60T17/08 | [1996/14] | CPC: |
B60T17/085 (EP,US);
B60T17/083 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1996/14] | Title | German: | Ausrichtsystem für gelochte Membran für Federspeicherbremszylinder | [1998/22] | English: | Perforate diaphragm alignment system for spring brake actuators | [1996/14] | French: | Système d'alignement d'un diaphragme perforé pour actionneur de frein à ressort | [1998/22] |
Former [1996/14] | Ausrichtsystem für gelockte Membran für Federspeicherbremszylinder | ||
Former [1996/14] | Système d'alignement d'un diaphragme perforé pour actuateur de frein à ressort | Examination procedure | 19.09.1996 | Examination requested [1996/46] | 02.07.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.10.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.05.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.09.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.12.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 18.12.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.12.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0315463 (INDIAN HEAD INC [US]) [A] 1,12,18 * column 4, line 28 - line 51; figure 1 *; | [A]WO9421501 (NAI ANCHORLOK INC [US], et al) [A] 1,12,18 * the whole document * |