EP0702477 - System for signatureless transmission and reception of data packets between computer networks [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.12.2005 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.12.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.01.2006 [2006/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SUN MICROSYSTEMS, INC. 2550 Garcia Avenue Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | [1996/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mulligan, Geoffrey 3330 Whimbrel Court Fremont, California 94555 / US | 02 /
Patterson, Martin 5 Rue de Boston F-38000 Grenoble / FR | 03 /
Scott, Glenn 324 East Iowa Avenue Sunnyvale, California 94086 / US | 04 /
Aziz, Ashar 4180 Tanager Common Fremont, California 94555 / US | [1996/12] | Representative(s) | WP Thompson 8th Floor 1 Mann Island Liverpool L3 1BP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/12] | W.P. Thompson & Co. Coopers Building, Church Street Liverpool L1 3AB / GB | Application number, filing date | 95306466.4 | 14.09.1995 | [1996/12] | Priority number, date | US19940306337 | 15.09.1994 Original published format: US 306337 | [1996/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0702477 | Date: | 20.03.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0702477 | Date: | 28.07.1999 | [1999/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0702477 | Date: | 26.01.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.06.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06, H04L12/66 | [1999/29] | CPC: |
H04L63/0428 (EP,US);
H04L12/22 (EP,KR,US);
H04L12/4625 (EP,US);
H04L63/164 (EP,US);
H04L2212/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1996/12] | H04L29/06 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL, SE [1996/12] | Title | German: | System für signaturlose Übertragung und Empfang von Datenpaketen zwischen Computernetzwerken | [1996/12] | English: | System for signatureless transmission and reception of data packets between computer networks | [1996/12] | French: | Système pour la transmission et la réception sans signature de paquets de données entre réseaux d'ordinateurs | [1996/12] | Examination procedure | 28.01.2000 | Examination requested [2000/13] | 19.04.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.10.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.09.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.01.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.05.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.10.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 15.10.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.10.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.08.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 14.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY] - FORNE J ET AL, "HARDWARE IMPLEMENTATION OF A SECURE BRIDGE IN ETHERNET ENVIRONMENTS", PROCEEDINGS OF THE GLOBAL TELECOMMUNICATIONS CONFERENCE (GLOBECOM), HOUSTON, NOV. 29 - DEC. 2, 1993, INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS, (19931129), vol. 1, pages 177 - 181, XP000428050 [X] 1,4,6,9,11,13,14 * the whole document * [Y] 15 | [YA] - O'HIGGINS B ET AL, "SECURING INFORMATION IN X.25 NETWORKS", COMMUNICATIONS: CONNECTING THE FUTURE, SAN DIEGO, DEC. 2 - 5, 1990, INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS, (19901202), vol. 2, pages 1073 - 1078, XP000220997 [Y] 15 * abstract * * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0005] * * figures 1,2 * [A] 1,4,6,9,11,13,14 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/GLOCOM.1990.116667 | [A] - SHARP R L ET AL, "NETWORK SECURITY IN A HETEROGENEOUS ENVIRONMENT", AT & T TECHNICAL JOURNAL, (19940901), vol. 73, no. 5, pages 52 - 59, XP000475911 [A] 1,4,6,9,11,13-15 * page 57, column R, line 24 - page 58, column R, line 44 * |