EP0703353 - Diesel particulate filter apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.04.2001 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.04.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.05.2001 [2001/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ISUZU CERAMICS RESEARCH INSTITUTE CO., LTD. 8, Tsuchidana Fujisawa-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1996/13] | For all designated states ISUZU CERAMICS RESEARCH INSTITUTE CO., LTD. 8, Tsuchidana Fujisawa-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Suzuki, Shogo 5-5-11, Minamirinkan Yamato-shi, Kanagawa-ken, T 242 / JP | 02 /
Kawamura, Hideo 8-13-5, Okada, Samukawa-machi Kouza-gun, Kanagawa-ken, T 253-01 / JP | 03 /
Higashino, Akira Domile Shonan 203, 4-24-8 Shonandai Fujisawa-shi, Kanagawa-ken, T 252 / JP | [2000/22] |
Former [1996/13] | 01 /
Suzuki, Shogo 5-5-11, Minamirikan Yamato-shi, Kanagawa-ken, T 242 / JP | ||
02 /
Kawamura, Hideo 8-13-5, Okada, Samukawa-machi Kouza-gun, Kanagawa-ken, T 253-01 / JP | |||
03 /
Higashino, Akira Domile Shonan 203, 4-24-8 Shonandai Fujisawa-shi, Kanagawa-ken, T 252 / JP | Representative(s) | Jenkins, Peter David, et al Page White & Farrer Limited Bedford House 21A John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/13] | Jenkins, Peter David, et al PAGE WHITE & FARRER 54 Doughty Street London WC1N 2LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 95306523.2 | 15.09.1995 | [1996/13] | Priority number, date | JP19940251565 | 21.09.1994 Original published format: JP 25156594 | JP19940254158 | 26.09.1994 Original published format: JP 25415894 | JP19940254159 | 26.09.1994 Original published format: JP 25415994 | [1996/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0703353 | Date: | 27.03.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0703353 | Date: | 03.04.1996 | [1996/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0703353 | Date: | 07.06.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.02.1996 | Classification | IPC: | F01N3/02, B01D39/20 | [1996/13] | CPC: |
F01N3/0226 (EP,US);
B01D39/2044 (EP,US);
B01D39/2086 (EP,US);
F01N2330/12 (EP,US);
F01N2330/18 (EP,US);
F01N2370/22 (EP,US);
F02B3/06 (EP,US);
Y02T10/12 (EP,US);
Y10S55/10 (EP);
Y10S55/30 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1996/13] | Title | German: | Partikelfiltervorrichtung für Dieselmotoren | [1996/13] | English: | Diesel particulate filter apparatus | [1996/13] | French: | Appareil de filtrage de particules pour moteurs diesel | [1996/13] | Examination procedure | 11.07.1996 | Examination requested [1996/36] | 10.02.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.06.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.08.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.12.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.01.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.07.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.08.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 14.10.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.03.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.07.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.09.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.11.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.02.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 10.02.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.03.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP0223022 (MAN TECHNOLOGIE GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-3,8,9 * the whole document * [Y] 6,10-17; | [Y]EP0425433 (ALUSUISSE LONZA SERVICES AG [CH]) [Y] 6,16,17 * column 3, line 21 - column 5, line 24; figure - *; | [Y]DE2830707 (HOELTER HEINZ) [Y] 10-15 * page 3, paragraph L - page 4, paragraph 1 * * page 6, paragraph 1 - paragraph L; figure . *; | [A]US4680221 (MURAYAMA SADAMITSU [JP], et al) [A] 1,10,15 * column 2, line 6 - line 18 *; | [A]JPS62201939 | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 87, no. 41, Database accession no. 87-288528, & JPS62201939 A 19870905 (NIPPON OIL) [A] * abstract * | by applicant | JPH06114131 |