EP0703238 - A method for purifying O,S-dimethyl N-acetylphosphoramidothioate [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.11.2000 Database last updated on 10.05.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 06.02.2008 [2008/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumitomo Chemical Company, Limited 5-33, Kitahama 4-chome Chuo-ku Osaka 541-8550 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2000/02] | For all designated states Sumitomo Chemical Company, Limited 5-33, Kitahama 4-chome Chuo-ku Osaka 541-8550 / JP | ||
Former [1996/13] | For all designated states SUMITOMO CHEMICAL COMPANY, LIMITED Kitahama 4-chome 5-33 Chuo-ku Osaka 541 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sakito, Yoji 3-1-29-124, Kentokumachi Oita-shi, Oita-ken / JP | 02 /
Shirahata, Mamoru 2203 S-1-153, Oaza Higashiakeno Oita-shi, Oita-ken / JP | 03 /
Kiyoshima, Yujiro 2203 S-1-114, Oaza Higashiakeno Oita-shi, Oita-ken / JP | 04 /
Minamisaka, Kazuya 2203 S-1-154, Oaza Higashiakeno Oita-shi, Oita-ken / JP | 05 /
Iwata, Atsukazu 32-11, Gunkeshinmachi Takatsuki-shi, Osaka-fu / JP | [1996/13] | Representative(s) | Cresswell, Thomas Anthony, et al J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/13] | Cresswell, Thomas Anthony, et al J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 95306670.1 | 21.09.1995 | [1996/13] | Priority number, date | JP19940227885 | 22.09.1994 Original published format: JP 22788594 | [1996/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0703238 | Date: | 27.03.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0703238 | Date: | 12.01.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.12.1995 | Classification | IPC: | C07F9/24, C07F9/02 | [1996/13] | CPC: |
C07F9/025 (EP,US);
C07F9/24 (KR);
C07F9/2487 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1996/13] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Reinigung O,S-dimethyl N-acetylphosphoramidothioates | [1996/13] | English: | A method for purifying O,S-dimethyl N-acetylphosphoramidothioate | [1996/13] | French: | Procédé de purification du O,S-diméthyl N-acétylphosphoramido thioate | [1996/13] | Examination procedure | 06.09.1996 | Examination requested [1996/45] | 12.03.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 20.04.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 13.07.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.10.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 13.10.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.10.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 12.01.2000 | BE | 12.01.2000 | CH | 12.01.2000 | ES | 12.01.2000 | FR | 12.01.2000 | IT | 12.01.2000 | LI | 12.01.2000 | NL | 12.01.2000 | SE | 12.01.2000 | DK | 12.04.2000 | DE | 13.04.2000 | GB | 21.09.2000 | [2008/06] |
Former [2006/14] | AT | 12.01.2000 | |
BE | 12.01.2000 | ||
CH | 12.01.2000 | ||
ES | 12.01.2000 | ||
FR | 12.01.2000 | ||
LI | 12.01.2000 | ||
NL | 12.01.2000 | ||
SE | 12.01.2000 | ||
DK | 12.04.2000 | ||
DE | 13.04.2000 | ||
GB | 21.09.2000 | ||
Former [2003/45] | AT | 12.01.2000 | |
BE | 12.01.2000 | ||
CH | 12.01.2000 | ||
ES | 12.01.2000 | ||
LI | 12.01.2000 | ||
NL | 12.01.2000 | ||
SE | 12.01.2000 | ||
DK | 12.04.2000 | ||
DE | 13.04.2000 | ||
FR | 09.06.2000 | ||
GB | 21.09.2000 | ||
Former [2003/08] | AT | 12.01.2000 | |
BE | 12.01.2000 | ||
CH | 12.01.2000 | ||
ES | 12.01.2000 | ||
LI | 12.01.2000 | ||
NL | 12.01.2000 | ||
SE | 12.01.2000 | ||
DE | 13.04.2000 | ||
FR | 09.06.2000 | ||
GB | 21.09.2000 | ||
Former [2002/26] | AT | 12.01.2000 | |
BE | 12.01.2000 | ||
CH | 12.01.2000 | ||
ES | 12.01.2000 | ||
LI | 12.01.2000 | ||
SE | 12.01.2000 | ||
DE | 13.04.2000 | ||
FR | 09.06.2000 | ||
GB | 21.09.2000 | ||
Former [2002/23] | AT | 12.01.2000 | |
BE | 12.01.2000 | ||
CH | 12.01.2000 | ||
LI | 12.01.2000 | ||
SE | 12.01.2000 | ||
DE | 13.04.2000 | ||
FR | 09.06.2000 | ||
GB | 21.09.2000 | ||
Former [2002/12] | AT | 12.01.2000 | |
BE | 12.01.2000 | ||
CH | 12.01.2000 | ||
LI | 12.01.2000 | ||
DE | 13.04.2000 | ||
FR | 09.06.2000 | ||
GB | 21.09.2000 | ||
Former [2002/11] | AT | 12.01.2000 | |
BE | 12.01.2000 | ||
CH | 12.01.2000 | ||
LI | 12.01.2000 | ||
DE | 13.04.2000 | ||
FR | 09.06.2000 | ||
Former [2001/09] | AT | 12.01.2000 | |
BE | 12.01.2000 | ||
CH | 12.01.2000 | ||
LI | 12.01.2000 | ||
FR | 09.06.2000 | ||
Former [2001/08] | AT | 12.01.2000 | |
BE | 12.01.2000 | ||
CH | 12.01.2000 | ||
LI | 12.01.2000 | ||
Former [2000/52] | CH | 12.01.2000 | |
LI | 12.01.2000 | ||
Former [2000/50] | CH | 17.04.2000 | |
LI | 17.04.2000 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3917755 (FRANKE HANS G) [A] 1-15* column 7; example 4 *; | [A]EP0516212 (FMC CORP [US]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | by applicant | JPS4834583B | JPS6475494 |