EP0752237 - Rail-mounted stabilizer for surgical instrument [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.12.2000 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 19.02.2003 [2003/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Putman, John Michael 3707 Gaston Avenue, Suite 410 Dallas Texas 75246 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1997/02] | For all designated states Putman, John Michael 3707 Gaston Avenue, Suite 410 Dallas, Texas 75246 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1997/02] | Representative(s) | Lawrence, Malcolm Graham, et al Avidity IP Broers Building Hauser Forum 21 JJ Thomson Ave Cambridge CB3 0FA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/09] | Lawrence, Malcolm Graham, et al Hepworth, Lawrence, Bryer & Bizley Merlin House Falconry Court Baker's Lane Epping Essex CM16 5DQ / GB | ||
Former [1997/02] | Lawrence, Malcolm Graham Hepworth, Lawrence, Bryer & Bizley Merlin House Falconry Court Bakers Lane Epping Essex CM16 5DQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 95306848.3 | 28.09.1995 | [1997/02] | Priority number, date | US19940314517 | 28.09.1994 Original published format: US 314517 | [1997/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0752237 | Date: | 08.01.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0752237 | Date: | 01.03.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.08.1996 | Classification | IPC: | A61B19/00 | [1997/02] | CPC: |
A61B90/50 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00199 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00477 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00973 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1997/02] | Title | German: | An einer Bettschiene anbringbare Stabilisiervorrichtung für chirurgische Instrumente | [1997/02] | English: | Rail-mounted stabilizer for surgical instrument | [1997/02] | French: | Stabilisateur monté sur rail de lit d'hôpital pour supporter un instrument chirurgical | [1997/02] | Examination procedure | 07.07.1997 | Examination requested [1997/36] | 08.09.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.03.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.05.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.11.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.07.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.08.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.11.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 08.11.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.12.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 01.03.2000 | ES | 01.03.2000 | NL | 01.03.2000 | [2003/08] |
Former [2002/26] | AT | 01.03.2000 | |
ES | 01.03.2000 | ||
Former [2001/08] | AT | 01.03.2000 | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]EP0239409 (LIFE TECHNOLOGY RESEARCH FOUND [JP]) [Y] 1 * column 2, line 28 - line 55 * * column 5, line 30 - line 43; figures 1,2 * [A] 2,3,5,6; | [A]GB2252530 (EUROP DIRECT PARTNERSHIP LIMIT [GB]) [A] 9 * page 5, paragraph 3 - paragraph 4 ** page 6, paragraph 3 *; | [YA]EP0587948 (PUTMAN JOHN MICHAEL [US]) [Y] 7,8 * column 7, line 8 - line 23 * * column 8, line 30 - line 45; figure 3 * [A] 3,4; | [X]EP0595291 (IBM [US]) [X] 1,2,5,6,9,11,12 * column 5, line 1 - line 43 * * column 6, line 6 - line 25 * * column 6, line 38 - line 50 * * column 8, line 15 - line 28; figure 1 *; | [XY]WO9516396 (COMPUTER MOTION INC [US]) [X] 1-6,11 * page 7, line 1 - page 8, paragraph 3 * * page 21, paragraph 3 - page 22, paragraph 2; figures 14,18 * [Y] 1,7,8 |