blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0707022

EP0707022 - Method for preparation of arylene vinylene polymers and electroluminescent device including same [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.11.2000
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip10.11.2000No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 27.12.2000 [2000/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
AT&T Corp.
32 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10013-2412 / US
[1996/16]
Inventor(s)01 / Galvin-Donoghue, Mary
8 Lupine Lane
Titusville, New Jersey 08560 / US
02 / Son, Sehwan
37 Ethan Drive No. 1
Murray Hill, New Jersey 07974 / US
[1996/16]
Representative(s)Johnston, Kenneth Graham, et al
Lucent Technologies EUR-IP UK Ltd Unit 18, Core 3 Workzone Innova Business Park Electric Avenue
Enfield, EN3 7XB / GB
[N/P]
Former [1996/16]Johnston, Kenneth Graham, et al
AT&T (UK) Ltd. 5 Mornington Road
Woodford Green Essex, IG8 OTU / GB
Application number, filing date95307020.803.10.1995
[1996/16]
Priority number, dateUS1994032128711.10.1994         Original published format: US 321287
[1996/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0707022
Date:17.04.1996
Language:EN
[1996/16]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0707022
Date:17.07.1996
[1996/29]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0707022
Date:12.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/02]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.05.1996
ClassificationIPC:C08G61/02, C08G61/12, C09K11/06, H05B33/00, H01L33/00
[1996/16]
CPC:
H05B33/14 (EP,US); C08F14/00 (KR); C08G61/02 (EP,US);
C08G61/123 (EP,US); C08G61/126 (EP,US); C09K11/06 (EP,US);
H10K50/11 (EP,US); H10K85/111 (EP,US); H10K30/00 (US);
H10K85/114 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   NL [1996/16]
TitleGerman:Methode zur Darstellung von Arylen-Vinylen-Polymeren und diese enthaltende elektrolumineszente Vorrichtung[1996/16]
English:Method for preparation of arylene vinylene polymers and electroluminescent device including same[1996/16]
French:Méthode pour la préparation de polymères arylène-vinylène et dispositif électroluminescent les contenant[1996/16]
Examination procedure18.12.1996Examination requested  [1997/09]
27.04.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
03.11.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.03.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
16.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.09.1999Fee for grant paid
23.09.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2000/52]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.10.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
16.10.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
18.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]US3401152  (WESSLING RITCHIE A, et al);
 [A]US3706677  (WESSLING RITCHIE A, et al);
 [PX]EP0652243  (AT & T CORP [US]);
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.