EP0706261 - Detector cell for logarithmic amplifiers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.03.2002 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.03.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.05.2002 [2002/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Analog Devices, Inc. One Technology Way Norwood, MA 02062-9106 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1996/15] | For all designated states ANALOG DEVICES, INCORPORATED One Technology Way, P.O. Box 9106 Norwood, MA 02062-9106 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gilbert, Barrie 1100 NW Compton Drive, Suite 301, Beaverton Oregon 97006-1994 / US | [1996/15] | Representative(s) | Allen, William Guy Fairfax, et al J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/15] | Allen, William Guy Fairfax, et al J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 95307042.2 | 04.10.1995 | [1996/15] | Priority number, date | US19940317811 | 04.10.1994 Original published format: US 317811 | [1996/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0706261 | Date: | 10.04.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0706261 | Date: | 09.05.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.01.1996 | Classification | IPC: | H03G7/00 | [1996/15] | CPC: |
H03G7/001 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1996/15] | Title | German: | Detektorzelle für logarithmische Verstärker | [1996/15] | English: | Detector cell for logarithmic amplifiers | [1996/15] | French: | Cellule de détection pour amplificateurs logarithmiques | [1996/15] | Examination procedure | 08.10.1996 | Examination requested [1996/49] | 26.04.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.09.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.11.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 16.02.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 31.10.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.01.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 25.01.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.02.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5057717 (KIMURA KATSUJI [JP]) [X] 1,2,7-14,16-20 * column W *; | [X]EP0331246 (PHILIPS NV [NL]) [X] 1-4,7,17 * column W *; | [A]EP0505751 (NEC CORP [JP]) [A] 1-20 * column W *; | [A]US4680553 (KIMURA KATSUJI [JP], et al) [A] 1-20 * figures 11,15,16 *; | [PX]GB2280053 (NEC CORP [JP]) [PX] 1-4,7-11,17-20 * the whole document * |