26.12.2003 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.02.2004 [2004/07] |
19.09.2003 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.11.2003 [2003/45] |
04.01.2003 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.02.2003 [2003/08] |
23.11.2001 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.01.2002 [2002/02] |
30.03.2001 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 16.05.2001 [2001/20] |
02.03.2001 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.04.2001 [2001/16] |
26.01.2001 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.03.2001 [2001/11] |
14.04.2000 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 31.05.2000 [2000/22] |
10.03.2000 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
30.11.1999 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
30.11.1999 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
03.11.1999 |
Renewal fee |
|
20.08.1999 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
29.07.1999 |
Examination report or reply |
|
17.05.1999 |
Examination report or reply |
|
08.01.1999 |
Examination report or reply |
|
08.01.1999 |
First examination report |
|
06.10.1998 |
Renewal fee |
|
21.11.1997 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 07.01.1998 [1998/02] |
26.09.1997 |
Renewal fee |
|
18.04.1997 |
Publication of search report |
published on 04.06.1997 [1997/23] |
15.03.1996 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 01.05.1996 [1996/18] |