EP0708586 - Method of enabling transportation of articles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1996/17] | Methods of enabling transportation of articles | ||
[1998/43] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.05.2000 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.02.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 26.03.2003 [2003/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THOMAS & BETTS CORPORATION (a Tennessee Corporation) 1555 Lynnfield Road Memphis, Tennessee 38119 / US | [1999/24] |
Former [1996/17] | For all designated states THOMAS & BETTS CORPORATION 1555 Lynnfield Road Memphis Tennessee 38119 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NG, Joey Kiat-Hup Block 282 NO.06-434 Choa Chu Kang Avenue 3, Singapore 680282 / SG | 02 /
NG, Kok Hong Block 99C NO.05-19 Toa Payoh Lorong 2, Singapore 1231 / SG | [1999/27] |
Former [1996/17] | 01 /
NG, Joey Kiat-Hup Block 282 NO.06-434 Choa Chu Kang Avenue 3, Singapore 680282 / SG | ||
02 /
NG, Kak Hong Block 99C NO.05-19 Toa Payoh Lorong 2, Singapore 1231 / SG | Representative(s) | Howick, Nicholas Keith, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/24] | Howick, Nicholas Keith, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | ||
Former [1996/17] | Howick, Nicholas Keith CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 95307396.2 | 18.10.1995 | [1996/17] | Priority number, date | GB19940021135 | 20.10.1994 Original published format: GB 9421135 | [1996/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0708586 | Date: | 24.04.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0708586 | Date: | 07.07.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.02.1996 | Classification | IPC: | H05K13/04, B65G47/91 | [1996/17] | CPC: |
B65G47/91 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1996/17] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Fördern von Artikeln | [1996/17] | English: | Method of enabling transportation of articles | [1998/43] | French: | Méthode pour le transport d'articles | [1996/17] |
Former [1996/17] | Methods of enabling transportation of articles | Examination procedure | 18.10.1996 | Examination requested [1996/51] | 15.09.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.03.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.11.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.01.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.04.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 29.04.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.04.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 07.07.1999 | CH | 07.07.1999 | LI | 07.07.1999 | NL | 07.07.1999 | SE | 07.07.1999 | [2003/13] |
Former [2003/08] | BE | 07.07.1999 | |
CH | 07.07.1999 | ||
LI | 07.07.1999 | ||
NL | 07.07.1999 | ||
Former [2000/52] | BE | 07.07.1999 | |
CH | 07.07.1999 | ||
LI | 07.07.1999 | ||
Former [2000/50] | BE | 07.07.1999 | |
CH | 12.10.1999 | ||
LI | 12.10.1999 | ||
Former [2000/24] | BE | 07.07.1999 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE3710184 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1,3,9-13 * the whole document *; | [PX]EP0633634 (MOLEX INC [US]) [PX] 1-3,9-13 * column W *; | [X]DE3127120 (PHILIPS PATENTVERWALTUNG [DE]) [X] 1-3,11-13 * the whole document * |