EP0707813 - Work surfaces [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.05.1998 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.05.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.07.1998 [1998/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Orama Fabrications Ltd Azalea Close, Clover Nook Industrial Estate Somercotes Derbyshire DE55 4RF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/17] | For all designated states Orama Fabrications Ltd Azalea Close, Clover Nook Industrial Estate Somercotes, Derbyshire DE55 4RF / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Trevor, Bruce Wyndham 12 Abbey Drive Beeston, Nottingham / GB | 02 /
Crabtree, Michael Anthony 10 Ashton Way Overlane Park, Belper, DE5 0EX / GB | [1996/17] | Representative(s) | Singleton, Jeffrey, et al Eric Potter Clarkson, Park View House, 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/17] | Singleton, Jeffrey, et al Eric Potter Clarkson St. Mary's Court St. Mary's Gate Nottingham NG1 1LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 95307491.1 | 20.10.1995 | [1996/17] | Priority number, date | GB19940021163 | 20.10.1994 Original published format: GB 9421163 | [1996/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0707813 | Date: | 24.04.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0707813 | Date: | 26.03.1997 | [1997/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.02.1997 | Classification | IPC: | A47B96/18 | [1997/13] | CPC: |
A47B77/022 (EP);
A47B2200/0007 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1996/17] | A47B77/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, FR, GB, GR, IE, LI, NL, PT [1996/17] | Title | German: | Arbeitsplatten | [1996/17] | English: | Work surfaces | [1996/17] | French: | Surfaces de travail | [1996/17] | Examination procedure | 27.09.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1998/27] | 21.01.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1998/27] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 05.11.1997 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.1997 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3909178 (WESTAG & GETALIT AG [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract * * column 2, line 27 - line 46 *; | [A]DE8907305U (DUROPAL-WERK) [A] 1,8,9 * page 3 - page 4, paragraph 1; figures 1-3 *; | [A]DE3527006 (WREDE DUROPAL WERK) [A] 1 * abstract * * column 4, line 11 - line 55 *; | [AD]EP0234192 (WREDE DUROPAL WERK [DE]) [AD] 1,4,8,9,11 * abstract * * column 4, paragraph 1 *; | [A]DE3810053 (ROEMMLER H RESOPAL WERK GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,8 * abstract * * column 4, line 64 - column 5, line 30 *; | [A]EP0276433 (WESTAG & GETALIT AG [DE]) [A] 4,8 * abstract * | by applicant | DE3308947 | EP0234192 |