EP0709360 - Method for production of alcohol, ketone, and aldehyde by oxidation of hydrocarbon [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1996/18] | Method for production of alcohol, ketone, and alderhyde by oxidation of hydrocarbon | ||
[1999/01] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.11.1999 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.11.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.12.1999 [1999/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AGENCY OF INDUSTRIAL SCIENCE & TECHNOLOGY MINISTRY OF INTERNATIONAL TRADE & INDUSTRY 3-1 Kasumigaseki 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1996/18] | For all designated states AGENCY OF INDUSTRIAL SCIENCE & TECHNOLOGY MINISTRY OF INTERNATIONAL TRADE & INDUSTRY 3-1 Kasumigaseki 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Haruta, Masatake 1-2-22-303 Hachitsuka Ikeda-shi, Osaka / JP | 02 /
Tsubota, Susumu 19-6-209 Midorigaokacho Ashiya-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | 03 /
Hayashi, Toshio 1-3-1B-403 Ibukidai Higashimachi, Nishi-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | [1996/18] | Representative(s) | Smith, Norman Ian, et al Cleveland 40-43 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1JQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/18] | Smith, Norman Ian, et al F.J. CLEVELAND & COMPANY 40-43 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1JQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 95307502.5 | 23.10.1995 | [1996/18] | Priority number, date | JP19940289008 | 28.10.1994 Original published format: JP 28900894 | [1996/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0709360 | Date: | 01.05.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0709360 | Date: | 30.12.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/53] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.02.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C07C45/33, C07C29/50, C07D301/10 | [1996/18] | CPC: |
C07C29/50 (EP,US);
B01J23/52 (EP,US);
C07C45/33 (EP,US);
C07D301/04 (EP,US);
C07D301/10 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C07C29/50, C07C31/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1996/18] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Alkohols, Ketons und Aldehyds durch Oxidation eines Kohlenwasserstoffes | [1996/18] | English: | Method for production of alcohol, ketone, and aldehyde by oxidation of hydrocarbon | [1999/01] | French: | Procédé de production d'un alcool, d'une cétone et d'un aldéhyde par oxydation d'un hydrocarbure | [1996/18] |
Former [1996/18] | Method for production of alcohol, ketone, and alderhyde by oxidation of hydrocarbon | Examination procedure | 20.03.1996 | Examination requested [1996/20] | 12.05.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.07.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.01.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.03.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.05.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 02.05.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.10.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2398612 (INGOLFUR BERGSTEINSSON, et al) [A] 1,7 * column W *; | [A]US3723352 (ALEXANDER W, et al) [A] 1 * column W *; | [A]US4839327 (HARUTA MASATAKE [JP], et al) [A] 1-3 * column W *; | [A]JPH0616422 | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 94, no. 21, Database accession no. 94-061881, & JPH0616422 A 19940125 (AGENCY OF IND SCI & TECHNOLOGY) [A] 1-3 * abstract * |