EP0710475 - High refractive index and/or radio-opaque resins systems [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.09.2002 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.11.2002 [2002/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Abonetics Limited IRC in Biomedical Materials, Queen Mary & Westfield College, Mile End Road London E1 4NS / GB | [1998/17] |
Former [1996/19] | For all designated states THE LONDON HOSPITAL MEDICAL COLLEGE Turner Street Whitechapel London E1 2AD / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Davy, Kenneth Walter Michael 65 Poplar Way, Midhurst West Sussex GU29 9TB / GB | 02 /
Labella, Roberto Flat 3, 180 Broadhurst Gardens London NW6 3AY / GB | [1996/19] | Representative(s) | Allard, Susan Joyce, et al BOULT WADE TENNANT, Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/19] | Allard, Susan Joyce, et al BOULT, WADE & TENNANT 27 Furnival Street London EC4A 1PQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 95307505.8 | 23.10.1995 | [1996/19] | Priority number, date | GB19940022008 | 01.11.1994 Original published format: GB 9422008 | [1996/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0710475 | Date: | 08.05.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0710475 | Date: | 21.11.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.02.1996 | Classification | IPC: | A61K6/083 | [1996/19] | CPC: |
A61K6/75 (EP);
A61K6/76 (EP);
A61K6/77 (EP);
A61K6/838 (EP);
A61K6/887 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1996/19] | Title | German: | Harzsysteme mit hohem Brechungsindex und/oder Röntgenopazität | [1996/19] | English: | High refractive index and/or radio-opaque resins systems | [1996/19] | French: | Systèmes de résines à indice de réfraction élevé et/ou radio-opacité | [1996/19] | Examination procedure | 28.10.1996 | Examination requested [1996/52] | 24.11.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.02.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.12.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.04.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.06.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 22.06.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.08.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.08.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE3342601 (BLENDAX WERKE SCHNEIDER CO) [X] 1,4,8,10-13 * page 3, line 47 - page 4, line 9 * * page 5, line 30 - page 6, line 10 * * page 5, line 1 - line 13 * * claim - *; | [X]GB2181144 (SANKIN IND CO) [X] 1,4,6 * page 1, line 61 - page 2, line 3 * * claim - * * page 3, line 1 - line 8 *; | [A]EP0401385 (MITSUBISHI RAYON CO [JP]); | [A]GB2163442 (NAT RES DEV); | [A]EP0268157 (DAIKIN IND LTD [JP]) | by applicant | EP19950303508 |