EP0709381 - Heterocyclic compounds and their preparation and use [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.12.2003 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2003 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | 05.12.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.01.2004 [2004/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ELI LILLY AND COMPANY Lilly Corporate Center Indianapolis, IN 46285 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1996/18] | For all designated states ELI LILLY AND COMPANY Lilly Corporate Center Indianapolis, Indiana 46285 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Alt, Charles A. 6366 Deerstand Road Greenwood, Indiana 46143 / US | 02 /
Merritt, Leander 3514 Coachman Drive Indianapolis, Indiana 46208 / US | 03 /
Mitch, Charles H. 3210 Grove Parkway Columbus, Indiana 47203 / US | 04 /
Rhodes, Gary A. 6273 Twyckenham Indianapolis, Indiana 46236 / US | 05 /
Robey, Roger L. 4831 Brentridge Parkway Greenwood, Indiana 46143 / US | 06 /
Van Meter, Eldon E. 5153 Heckman Way Greenwood, Indiana 46142 / US | 07 /
Ward, John S. 241 East Brunwick Avenue Indianapolis, Indiana 46227 / US | [1996/18] | Representative(s) | Pritchard, Judith, et al Eli Lilly and Company Limited Lilly Research Centre Erl Wood Manor Windlesham Surrey GU20 6PH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/29] | Pritchard, Judith, et al Eli Lilly and Company Limited Lilly Research Centre Erl Wood Manor Windlesham, Surrey GU20 6PH / GB | ||
Former [2001/17] | Denholm, Anna Marie, et al Eli Lilly and Company Limited, Lilly Research Center, Erl Wood Manor Windlesham, Surrey GU20 6PH / GB | ||
Former [1996/18] | Hudson, Christopher Mark, et al Lilly Industries Limited European Patent Operations Erl Wood Manor Windlesham Surrey GU20 6PH / GB | Application number, filing date | 95307513.2 | 23.10.1995 | [1996/18] | Priority number, date | US19940327766 | 24.10.1994 Original published format: US 327766 | US19950443673 | 01.06.1995 Original published format: US 443673 | [1996/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0709381 | Date: | 01.05.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.02.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C07D285/10, C07D451/02, C07D451/04, C07D451/06, C07D453/02, C07D417/12, C07D471/08, C07D487/08, A61K31/41, A61K31/435, A61K31/46, // (C07D471/08, 221:00, 209:00),(C07D471/08, 221:00, 221:00),(C07D487/08, 209:00, 209:00) | [1996/18] | CPC: |
C07D285/10 (EP,US);
C07D417/12 (EP,KR,US);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/08 (EP);
A61P25/18 (EP);
A61P25/20 (EP);
A61P25/24 (EP);
A61P25/26 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07D451/06 (EP,US);
C07D453/02 (EP,US);
C07D453/06 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1996/18] | Extension states | LT | 02.11.1995 | LV | 02.11.1995 | SI | 02.11.1995 | Title | German: | Heterocyclische Verbindungen und ihre Herstellung und Verwendung | [1996/18] | English: | Heterocyclic compounds and their preparation and use | [1996/18] | French: | Composés hétérocycliques, leur préparation et leur application | [1996/18] | Examination procedure | 02.11.1995 | Examination requested [1996/18] | 03.05.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/04] | 14.08.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2004/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2002 | 08   M06   Not yet paid | 31.10.2003 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AX]GB1161093 (MERCK & CO INC [US]) [A] 1 * claims 15,17,20,21 * [X] 26; | [X]GB1174178 (MERCK & CO INC [US]) [X] 1,22 * page 1, line 16 - line 20; claims 1,2,6,8 *; | [X]CH484934 (CHEMIE LINZ AG [AT]) [X] 1,22 * examples 1-6; claim - *; | [A]GB1190359 (CHEMIE LINZ AG [AT]) [A] 22 * examples 1-3 *; | [AX]DE1914496 (LENTIA GMBH) [A] 1 * examples 1-3; claim - * [X] 26; | [A]EP0081782 (MERCK & CO INC [US]) [A] 22 * example 2, starting material *; | [AD]US5043345 (SAUERBERG PER [DK], et al) [AD] 1,32-34 * column 3, line 20 - line 38; claims 1,4,6 *; | [A]WO9203433 (NOVO NORDISK AS [DK]) [A] 1,32-34 * page 1, line 21 - page 2, line 3; claims 1,4,5,8,9 *; | [A]WO9203431 (NOVO NORDISK AS [DK]) [A] 1,32-34 * page 1, line 21 - page 2, line 1; claims 1,4-9 *; | [AX]EP0604353 (NEUROSEARCH AS [DK]) [A] 1 * column 25, line 4 * [X] 26; | [A]WO9420496 (NOVO NORDISK AS [DK]) [A] 1,32-34 * page 1, line 20 - page 2, line 1; claims 1,4-18 *; | [A]WO9420495 (NOVO NORDISK AS [DK]) [A] 1,32-34 * page 1, line 20 - page 2, line 1; claims 1,4-18 *; | [AP]WO9427996 (NOVO NORDISK AS [DK], et al) [AP] 1* claim 1 * |