blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0713132

EP0713132 - Chemical sensitisation of silver halide emulsions [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  26.10.2001
Database last updated on 09.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip15.08.2008Change - applicantpublished on 17.09.2008  [2008/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Eastman Kodak Company
343 State Street
Rochester, NY 14650-2201 / US
[N/P]
Former [2008/38]For all designated states
Eastman Kodak Company
343 State Street
Rochester NY 14650-2201 / US
Former [2000/46]For all designated states
EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY (a New Jersey corporation)
343 State Street
Rochester, New York 14650 / US
Former [1996/21]For all designated states
MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY
3M Center, P.O. Box 33427
St. Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Grzeskowiak, Nicholas E.
52 Broadway Avenue
Harlow, Essex / GB
02 / Hobson, Rachel J.
20 Willowfield
Harlow, Essex CM18 6RR / GB
03 / Mott, Andrew W.
50 Portland Road
Bishop's Stortford, Herts., CM23 3SJ / GB
[1996/21]
Representative(s)Bowman, Paul Alan, et al
Marks & Clerk LLP
90 Long Acre
London
WC2E 9RA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/46]Bowman, Paul Alan, et al
LLOYD WISE, TREGEAR & CO., Commonwealth House, 1-19 New Oxford Street
London WC1A 1LW / GB
Former [1996/21]Bowman, Paul Alan
LLOYD WISE, TREGEAR & CO., Commonwealth House, 1-19 New Oxford Street
London WC1A 1LW / GB
Application number, filing date95307621.326.10.1995
[1996/21]
Priority number, dateGB1994002326618.11.1994         Original published format: GB 9423266
[1996/21]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0713132
Date:22.05.1996
Language:EN
[1996/21]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0713132
Date:20.12.2000
Language:EN
[2000/51]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.01.1996
ClassificationIPC:G03C1/09, G03C1/04, G03C1/053
[1996/21]
CPC:
G03C1/053 (EP,US); G03C1/04 (EP,US); G03C1/09 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [1996/21]
TitleGerman:Chemische Sensibilisierung von Silberhalogenidemulsionen[1996/21]
English:Chemical sensitisation of silver halide emulsions[1996/21]
French:Sensibilisation chimique d'émulsions à l'halogénure d'argent[1996/21]
Examination procedure06.11.1996Examination requested  [1997/02]
03.08.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
20.10.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.01.2000Fee for grant paid
20.01.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)21.09.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/50]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.10.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
08.10.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
15.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
09.10.2000Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIT20.12.2000
[2008/06]
Documents cited:Search[XY]JPH01115906  (MITA INDUSTRIAL CO LTD) [X] 1,4,6-8 * abstract * * page 1, column R, line 16 * * page 4, column L, line 14 * [Y] 9-12;
 [Y]GB942932  (KODAK LTD) [Y] 9,10,12 * page 10, line 71 - line 86 * * page 11, line 38 - line 40; claims 1-8 *;
 [Y]US3046133  (MINSK LOUIS M) [Y] 9,10,12 * column 6, line 34 - line 43 * * column 7, line 38 - line 39; claims 1-7 *;
 [Y]US3917485  (MORGAN JOHN) [Y] 11 * claims 1,16,17 *;
 [A]GB927178  (BEXFORD LTD) [A] 2,3,5,13,14 * claims 1,11-16 *
by applicantUS3779769
 US3813247
 US5041367
 JPH03144440
 JPH04151140
 JPH04235546
 US5254456
 US5079138
 US5061614
 EP0348934
 JPS6479742
 SU863595
 BE767486
 US4621041
 US4784933
 US5028521
    - STROEBEL ET AL., Photographic Materials and Processes, FOCAL PRESS, (1986), page 263
    - S.E. SHEPPARD, "Photographic Gelatin", PHOTOGRAPHIC JOURNAL, (192508), pages 380 - 387
    - HARAOUBIA, GRESSIER, LEVESQUE, DIE MAKROMOL. CHEMIE, (1975), vol. 176, page 2143
    - BULL. CHEM. SOC. JAPAN, (1968), vol. 41, page 707
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.