Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH08208420 | Global Dossier | 13.08.1996 | A | Priority number | Date | US34838294 | 02.12.1994 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0716848 | Global Dossier | 22.12.1999 | A3 | EP0716848 | 19.06.1996 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US34838294 | 02.12.1994 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2161388 | 03.06.1996 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US34838294 | 02.12.1994 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA959203 | 30.04.1997 | B | Priority number | Date | US34838294 | 02.12.1994 |