EP0716848 - Cosmetic emulsions with a deposition triggering lipid system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.09.2001 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.09.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.11.2001 [2001/45] | Applicant(s) | For:GB
Unilever PLC Unilever House Blackfriars London Greater London EC4P 4BQ / GB | For:CH
DE
ES
FR
IT
LI
NL
SE
Unilever N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1996/25] | For:GB
UNILEVER PLC Unilever House Blackfriars London EC4P 4BQ / GB | ||
For:CH
DE
ES
FR
IT
LI
NL
SE
UNILEVER N.V. Weena 455 NL-3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Znaiden, Alexander 110 Fox Road Trumbull, Connecticut 06611 / US | 02 /
Cheney, Michael Charles 383 Sigwin Drive Fairfield, Connecticut 06430 / US | 03 /
Ziegler, Philip Dale 19 Palmer Lane Oxford, Connecticut 06478 / US | [1996/25] | Representative(s) | Evans, Jacqueline Gail Victoria, et al Unilever plc Patent Division Colworth House Sharnbrook Bedford MK44 1LQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/25] | Evans, Jacqueline Gail Victoria, et al Unilever plc Patent Division Colworth House Sharnbrook Bedford MK44 1LQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 95307685.8 | 27.10.1995 | [1996/25] | Priority number, date | US19940348382 | 02.12.1994 Original published format: US 348382 | [1996/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0716848 | Date: | 19.06.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0716848 | Date: | 22.12.1999 | [1999/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.11.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A61K7/48 | [1996/25] | CPC: |
A61K8/06 (EP);
A61K8/31 (EP);
A61K8/55 (EP);
A61K8/553 (EP);
A61K8/63 (EP);
A61K8/922 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1996/25] | Title | German: | Die kosmetische Emulsionen mit ein Lipidsystem für Anregung zur Ablagerung | [1996/25] | English: | Cosmetic emulsions with a deposition triggering lipid system | [1996/25] | French: | Les émulsions cosmétiques avec un système lipide de déclenchement de dépôt | [1996/25] | Examination procedure | 17.01.2000 | Examination requested [2000/12] | 01.05.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2001/45] | 06.06.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2001/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2000 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS61233099 ; | [X]JPS62148424 ; | [X]JPH03293024 ; | [X]JPS57209207 ; | [A]GB633062 (BENJAMIN CLAYTON, et al) [A] 1,3,6,8 * the whole document *; | [DA]US5310556 (ZIEGLER PHILIP D [US]) [DA] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [DA]US4760096 (SAKAI KIRK [US], et al) [DA] 1-8 * the whole document * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1986, no. 48, Database accession no. 1986-315327, XP002120326 & JPS61233099 A 19861017 (TOA KAGAKU KK) [X] 1,3,6,8 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19871210), vol. 011, no. 379, Database accession no. (C - 463), & JP62148424 A 19870702 (RIKEN VITAMIN CO LTD) [X] 1,3,4,6,8 * abstract * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1992, no. 06, Database accession no. 1992-046393, XP002120327 & JPH03293024 A 19911224 (NIHON SURFACTANT KOGYO) [X] 1,3,6,8 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19830315), vol. 007, no. 061, Database accession no. (C - 156), & JP57209207 A 19821222 (KANEBO KK) [X] 1,3,6,8 * abstract * | by applicant | US4760096 | WO9001323 | US4855090 | US5310556 | US4939179 |