EP0712894 - Impact modified vinyl aromatic-vinyl cyanide copolymer compositions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 06.08.1999 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.08.1999 | Refusal of application | published on 22.09.1999 [1999/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1996/21] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kuruganti, Vijaya Kumar 33 Coventry Court Washington, West Virginia 26181 / US | 02 /
Gaggar, Satish Kumar Dupont Manor, Box 349, Rt. 3 Parkersburg, West Virginia 26101 / US | 03 /
St Jean, Robert Arthur 45 Lake Drive Parkersburg, West Virginia 26101 / US | [1996/21] | Representative(s) | Szary, Anne Catherine, et al GPO Europe GE International Inc. The Ark 201 Talgarth Road Hammersmith London W6 8BJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/21] | Szary, Anne Catherine, et al London Patent Operation, GE Technical Services Co. Inc., Essex House, 12-13 Essex Street London WC2R 3AA / GB | Application number, filing date | 95307902.7 | 06.11.1995 | [1996/21] | Priority number, date | US19940342464 | 21.11.1994 Original published format: US 342464 | [1996/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0712894 | Date: | 22.05.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0712894 | Date: | 02.04.1997 | [1997/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.02.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C08L25/12, // (C08L25/12, 51:04) | [1996/21] | CPC: |
C08L25/12 (EP);
C08L51/04 (EP);
C08L55/02 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C08L25/12, C08L2666/24 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [1996/21] | Title | German: | Schlagzähmodifizierte Zusammensetzung aus aromatischem Vinyl-Vinylcyanid-Copolymer | [1996/21] | English: | Impact modified vinyl aromatic-vinyl cyanide copolymer compositions | [1996/21] | French: | Composition résistante aux chocs à base d'un copolymère d'un composé vinylaromatique et de cyanure de vinyle | [1996/21] | Examination procedure | 02.10.1997 | Examination requested [1997/49] | 09.03.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.09.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.11.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 27.04.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1999/38] | 07.05.1999 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1999/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0116330 (BAYER AG [DE]) [X] 1-9 * page 4, line 11 - line 18 * * page 6, line 26 - page 7, line 4 * * page 11, line 9 - page 12, line 16; example VI; table 1 *; | [X]EP0488932 (BAYER AG [DE]) [X] 9 * page 2, line 11 - line 12 *; | [A]EP0129796 (BASF AG [DE]) [A] 1 * page 2, line 15 - line 32 * |