EP0711083 - Recording/reproducing apparatus for data packet stream [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 21.07.2000 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.07.2000 | Refusal of application | published on 06.09.2000 [2000/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken 210-0913 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1996/19] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken 210 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sakazaki, Yoshihisa, c/o Intellectual Prop. Div. Toshiba Corp., 1-1-1, Shibaura, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Abe, Shuji, c/o Intellectual Prop. Div. Toshiba Corp., 1-1-1, Shibaura, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [1996/19] | Representative(s) | Muir, Ian Robertson, et al Haseltine Lake Lincoln House 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/19] | Muir, Ian R., et al HASELTINE LAKE & CO. Hazlitt House 28 Southampton Buildings Chancery Lane London WC2A 1AT / GB | Application number, filing date | 95307935.7 | 07.11.1995 | [1996/19] | Priority number, date | JP19940272621 | 07.11.1994 Original published format: JP 27262194 | [1996/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0711083 | Date: | 08.05.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0711083 | Date: | 07.05.1997 | [1997/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.03.1997 | Classification | IPC: | H04N9/80 | [1996/19] | CPC: |
H04N9/8042 (EP,US);
G11B20/10 (KR);
H04N9/8233 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1996/19] | Title | German: | Aufnahme-/Wiedergabevorrichtung für Datenpaketstrom | [1996/19] | English: | Recording/reproducing apparatus for data packet stream | [1996/19] | French: | Appareil d'enregistrement/de reproduction pour courant de paquets de données | [1996/19] | Examination procedure | 04.12.1995 | Examination requested [1996/19] | 28.08.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.03.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.09.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 18.05.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.08.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 24.03.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [2000/36] | 04.04.2000 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2000/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.1999 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [PXA]WO9527977 (PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [PX] 1-9 * page 5, line 12 - page 6, line 30 * * page 7, line 29 - page 8, line 3 * * page 19, line 28 - page 20, line 23 * * figures 8,13 * * page 29, line 14 - page 30, line 24 * * page 23, line 21 - page 24, line 31 * [PA] 10,11; | [A]WO9102419 (BELL TELEPHONE MFG [BE], et al) [A] 1,8 * page 5, line 11 - line 33 *; | [E]EP0710021 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [E] 1-9 * column 8, line 12 - line 43 * * column 14, line 27 - column 16, line 16; figure 10 * |