EP0711874 - Crash attenuator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.10.2000 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 06.02.2008 [2008/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ENERGY ABSORPTION SYSTEMS, INC. One East Wacker Drive Chicago Illinois 60601 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1996/20] | For all designated states ENERGY ABSORPTION SYSTEMS, INC. One East Wacker Drive Chicago, Illinois 60601 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Oberth, Michael H. 915 Figueroa Street Folsom, California 95630 / US | 02 /
Machado, John V. 4705 Acclaro Court Antelope, California 95843 / US | [1996/20] | Representative(s) | Bayliss, Geoffrey Cyril, et al BOULT WADE TENNANT Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/20] | Bayliss, Geoffrey Cyril, et al BOULT, WADE & TENNANT 27 Furnival Street London EC4A 1PQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 95307973.8 | 08.11.1995 | [1996/20] | Priority number, date | US19940339137 | 14.11.1994 Original published format: US 339137 | [1996/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0711874 | Date: | 15.05.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0711874 | Date: | 31.07.1996 | [1996/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0711874 | Date: | 29.12.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.06.1996 | Classification | IPC: | E01F15/14 | [1996/20] | CPC: |
E01F1/00 (KR);
E01F15/146 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [1996/20] | Title | German: | Aufpralldämpfvorrichtung | [1996/20] | English: | Crash attenuator | [1996/20] | French: | Dispositif absorbant l'énergie en cas d'accident | [1996/20] | Examination procedure | 10.10.1996 | Examination requested [1996/50] | 14.05.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.06.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.06.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.10.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.11.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.12.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.03.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.06.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.09.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 07.09.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.09.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 29.12.1999 | CH | 29.12.1999 | ES | 29.12.1999 | IT | 29.12.1999 | LI | 29.12.1999 | NL | 29.12.1999 | SE | 29.12.1999 | DK | 29.03.2000 | PT | 29.03.2000 | DE | 30.03.2000 | [2008/06] |
Former [2003/45] | BE | 29.12.1999 | |
CH | 29.12.1999 | ||
ES | 29.12.1999 | ||
LI | 29.12.1999 | ||
NL | 29.12.1999 | ||
SE | 29.12.1999 | ||
DK | 29.03.2000 | ||
PT | 29.03.2000 | ||
DE | 30.03.2000 | ||
Former [2003/08] | BE | 29.12.1999 | |
CH | 29.12.1999 | ||
ES | 29.12.1999 | ||
LI | 29.12.1999 | ||
NL | 29.12.1999 | ||
SE | 29.12.1999 | ||
PT | 29.03.2000 | ||
DE | 30.03.2000 | ||
Former [2002/26] | BE | 29.12.1999 | |
CH | 29.12.1999 | ||
ES | 29.12.1999 | ||
LI | 29.12.1999 | ||
SE | 29.12.1999 | ||
PT | 29.03.2000 | ||
DE | 30.03.2000 | ||
Former [2002/23] | BE | 29.12.1999 | |
CH | 29.12.1999 | ||
LI | 29.12.1999 | ||
SE | 29.12.1999 | ||
PT | 29.03.2000 | ||
DE | 30.03.2000 | ||
Former [2002/11] | BE | 29.12.1999 | |
CH | 29.12.1999 | ||
LI | 29.12.1999 | ||
PT | 29.03.2000 | ||
DE | 30.03.2000 | ||
Former [2000/52] | BE | 29.12.1999 | |
CH | 29.12.1999 | ||
LI | 29.12.1999 | ||
PT | 29.03.2000 | ||
Former [2000/50] | BE | 29.12.1999 | |
PT | 29.03.2000 | ||
CH | 03.04.2000 | ||
LI | 03.04.2000 | ||
Former [2000/43] | BE | 29.12.1999 | |
PT | 29.03.2000 | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]WO8604028 (HEXCEL CORP [US]) [Y] 15-18 * page 7, line 6 - line 20; figures 1,2A * [A] 5-8; | [DYA]US4711481 (KRAGE WILLIAM G [US], et al) [DY] 15-18 * the whole document * [A] 5-8; | [DA]US5192157 (LATURNER JOHN F [US]) [DA] 1,2,11,12,15 * column 6, line 63 - column 7, line 31; figures 11A 11B 12A-C *; | [DA]US3944187 (WALKER GRANT W) [DA] 13,15 * column 2, line 24 - line 60; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US4101115 (MEINZER LESTER N) [A] 13 * column 2, line 66 - column 3, line 4; figure 5 * | by applicant | USRE29544E | US4289419 | US4934661 | US5192157 | US3944187 | US4711481 |