blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0713106

EP0713106 - Oxygen permeable contact lens having a hydrophilic surface and method for producing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.06.2003
Database last updated on 09.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip03.10.2003Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 19.11.2003  [2003/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Menicon Co., Ltd.
21-19, Aoi 3-chome Naka-ku Nagoya-shi
Aichi-ken / JP
[N/P]
Former [1996/21]For all designated states
Menicon Co., Ltd.
21-19, Aoi 3-chome Naka-ku
Nagoya-shi Aichi-ken / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Nakada, Kazuhiko, Menicon Co., Ltd.
12-7, Biwajima 3-chome, Nishi-ku
Nagoya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP
02 / Saito, Naomi, Menicon Co., Ltd.
12-7, Biwajima 3-chome, Nishi-ku
Nagoya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP
03 / Nishibayashi, Misako, Menicon Co., Ltd.
12-7, Biwajima 3-chome, Nishi-ku
Nagoya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP
04 / Nakamura, Atsuyuki, Menicon Co., Ltd.
12-7, Biwajima 3-chome, Nishi-ku
Nagoya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP
05 / Hishida, Yasuhito, Menicon Co., Ltd.
12-7, Biwajima 3-chome, Nishi-ku
Nagoya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP
[1996/21]
Representative(s)Paget, Hugh Charles Edward, et al
Mewburn Ellis LLP
City Tower
40 Basinghall Street
London EC2V 5DE / GB
[N/P]
Former [1996/21]Paget, Hugh Charles Edward, et al
MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway
London WC2B 6HP / GB
Application number, filing date95308260.917.11.1995
[1996/21]
Priority number, dateJP1994028316917.11.1994         Original published format: JP 28316994
JP1995023962319.09.1995         Original published format: JP 23962395
[1996/21]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0713106
Date:22.05.1996
Language:EN
[1996/21]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0713106
Date:14.08.2002
Language:EN
[2002/33]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.03.1996
ClassificationIPC:G02B1/10
[1996/21]
CPC:
G02B1/043 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1996/21]
TitleGerman:Sauerstoffdurchlässige Kontaktlinse mit hydrophiler Oberfläche und Verfahren zur Herstellung derselben[1996/21]
English:Oxygen permeable contact lens having a hydrophilic surface and method for producing the same[1996/21]
French:Lentilles de contact perméables à l'oxygène ayant une surface hydrophile et procédé de fabrication[1996/21]
Examination procedure07.12.1995Examination requested  [1996/21]
15.09.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.09.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.02.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.05.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.11.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
18.01.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
22.02.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.05.2002Fee for grant paid
16.05.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP01112562.2  / EP1154287
Opposition(s)15.05.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/32]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.11.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
23.11.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
23.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
22.11.2000Renewal fee patent year 06
22.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 07
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR21.02.2003
[2003/47]
Documents cited:Search[X]WO9300391  (BIOINTERACTIONS LTD [GB]) [X] 1,2,4-8 * claims 5,8,24 *;
 [XP]US5409731  (NAKAGAWA AKIRA [JP], et al) [XP] 1-8 * claims 2,10 *
by applicantJPH04104220
 US4594401
 JPS6255122B
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.