EP0719681 - Air bag disabler control circuit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.07.1999 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.07.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.08.1999 [1999/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FORD MOTOR COMPANY The American Road Dearborn, MI 48126 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1996/27] | For all designated states Ford Motor Company The American Road Dearborn, MI 48126 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Simmons, Paul 51687 Deborah Circle Chesterfield, Michigan 48047 / US | 02 /
Borninski, Thomas 6901 Ardsley Drive Canton, Michigan 48187 / US | 03 /
Niesluchowski, Matt 3869 Victoria Troy, Michigan 48083 / US | 04 /
Boran, Colm 21899 Shadybrook Drive Novi, Michigan 48375 / US | [1996/27] | Representative(s) | Messulam, Alec Moses, et al Harrison IP Limited 3 Ebor House London Ebor Business Park Millfield Lane Nether Poppleton York YO26 6QY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/27] | Messulam, Alec Moses, et al A. Messulam & Co. 24 Broadway Leigh on Sea Essex SS9 1BN / GB | Application number, filing date | 95308475.3 | 27.11.1995 | [1996/27] | Priority number, date | US19940456275 | 27.12.1994 Original published format: US 456275 | [1996/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0719681 | Date: | 03.07.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0719681 | Date: | 26.08.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.04.1996 | Classification | IPC: | B60R21/32 | [1996/27] | CPC: |
B60R21/01564 (EP,US);
B60R21/0173 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1996/27] | Title | German: | Steuerschaltung für eine Luftsack-Ausschaltungsvorrichtung. | [1996/27] | English: | Air bag disabler control circuit | [1996/27] | French: | Circuit de contrôle pour un dispositif de désactivation d'un coussin d'air | [1996/27] | Examination procedure | 11.11.1996 | Examination requested [1997/02] | 09.06.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.10.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.11.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.02.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.03.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 05.03.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.05.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]US5324074 (CHRISTIAN RONALD A [US], et al) [DA] 1,7 * column 3, line 33 - line 65; figure - *; | [A]US3767002 (GILLUND A) [A] 1,7 * column 2, line 37 - column 3, line 18; figure . *; | [A]DE4237142 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [A] 1,7 * column 2, line 29 - line 63 * | by applicant | US5324074 | US5234228 | US5161820 |