EP0716543 - Multi-picture television receiver [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.12.2004 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.12.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.02.2005 [2005/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken 210-0913 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2004/09] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken 210-0913 / JP | ||
Former [1996/24] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken 210 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Koichi, Yamaguchi B-306, 77-3 Tokiwa-cho Fukaya-shi, Saitama-ken 366 / JP | [1996/24] | Representative(s) | Maury, Richard Philip, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/24] | Maury, Richard Philip, et al MARKS & CLERK, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 95308795.4 | 05.12.1995 | [1996/24] | Priority number, date | JP19940303884 | 07.12.1994 Original published format: JP 30388494 | [1996/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0716543 | Date: | 12.06.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0716543 | Date: | 02.06.1999 | [1999/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0716543 | Date: | 25.02.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.04.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/45 | [1996/24] | CPC: |
H04N7/0122 (EP,US);
H04N5/445 (EP,US);
H04N5/45 (EP,US);
H04N5/46 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [1996/24] | Title | German: | Fernsehempfänger mit einer Mehrfachbildwiedergabe | [1996/24] | English: | Multi-picture television receiver | [1996/24] | French: | Récepteur de télévision avec un affichage à images multiples | [1996/24] | Examination procedure | 22.12.1995 | Examination requested [1996/24] | 07.02.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.06.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.07.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.11.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 26.11.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.11.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5347318 (KOBAYASHI TAKASHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-4,7 * the whole document *; | [A]US5363143 (DUFFIELD DAVID J [US]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0539033 (SHARP KK [JP]) [A] 2,3 * page 3, line 1 - line 5 *; | [A]GB2262407 (SONY CORP [JP]) [A] 4,7 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0339675 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 4,7 * figure 1 *; | [A] - ABE ET AL, "double-window tv displays full-color images side by side", JEE JOURNAL OF ELECTRONIC ENGINEERING, TOKYO JP, (199410), vol. 31, no. 334, pages 35 - 37, XP000469200 |