EP0717453 - Manufacturing method of packed battery [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.09.1998 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.10.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 19.11.2008 [2008/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [2008/47] |
Former [1996/25] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka-fu 571 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Harima, Yukio 1-2-5-1101, Namiyoke, Minato-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 552 / JP | 02 /
Nakamura, Masao 1-12-21 Enzou Chigasaki-shi, Kanagawa 253 / JP | 03 /
Nonoshita, Takashi 3-4-2-306 Daigiri Fujisawa-shi, Kanagawa 251 / JP | 04 /
Uehara, Isao 678-4 Nishitomioka Isehara-shi, Kanagawa 259-11 / JP | 05 /
Nakatsuka, Saburo 566-49 Hazukashi Furukawa-machi, Fushimi-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 612 / JP | [1996/25] | Representative(s) | Crawford, Andrew Birkby, et al A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/25] | Crawford, Andrew Birkby, et al A.A. THORNTON & CO. Northumberland House 303-306 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 95309075.0 | 13.12.1995 | [1996/25] | Priority number, date | JP19940313417 | 16.12.1994 Original published format: JP 31341794 | [1996/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0717453 | Date: | 19.06.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0717453 | Date: | 05.11.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.04.1996 | Classification | IPC: | H01M2/20, H01M2/22, H01M6/44 | [1996/25] | CPC: |
B23K11/115 (EP,US);
H01M50/51 (EP,US);
H01M50/516 (EP,US);
H01M6/44 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49114 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1996/25] | Title | German: | Herstellungsverfahren einer verpackten Batterie | [1996/25] | English: | Manufacturing method of packed battery | [1996/25] | French: | Méthode de fabrication d'une batterie empaquetée | [1996/25] | Examination procedure | 05.08.1996 | Examination requested [1996/41] | 19.02.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.04.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.07.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 18.07.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.08.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/44] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS6226761 ; | [A]JPS63105460 ; | [A]JPS59169076 ; | [A]FR1188709 (ACCUMULATEURS FIXES) [A] * figures 1,2 *; | [A]US3615867 (CICH EVERETT R, et al); | [A]DE2451332 (MABUCHI MOTOR CO) [A] 1 * page 3, paragraph L - page 4, paragraph 2; figure 3; claims 1,3 *; | [A]FR2335962 (ACCUMULATEURS FIXES [FR]); | [A]US5204194 (MILLER TED J [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 2, line 49 - column 3, line 20; figure 9; claims 1-3 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19870702), vol. 011, no. 204, Database accession no. (E - 520), & JP62026761 A 19870204 (SHIN KOBE ELECTRIC MACH CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880919), vol. 012, no. 348, Database accession no. (E - 659), & JP63105460 A 19880510 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19850130), vol. 009, no. 023, Database accession no. (E - 293), & JP59169076 A 19840922 (FUJI DENKI KAGAKU KK) [A] 1 * abstract * |