EP0720941 - Rail transportable ramps for circus loading standard high semi-trailers on special unit trains [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.06.2000 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.06.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.08.2000 [2000/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1996/28] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hapeman, Martin Jay 101 Valley View Drive Edinboro, Pennsylvania 16412 / US | [1996/28] | Representative(s) | Szary, Anne Catherine, et al GPO Europe GE International Inc. The Ark 201 Talgarth Road Hammersmith London W6 8BJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/29] | Szary, Anne Catherine, et al London Patent Operation, GE Technical Services Co. Inc., Essex House, 12-13 Essex Street London WC2R 3AA / GB | ||
Former [1996/28] | Pratt, Richard Wilson, et al London Patent Operation G.E. Technical Services Co. Inc. Essex House 12/13 Essex Street London WC2R 3AA / GB | Application number, filing date | 95309194.9 | 18.12.1995 | [1996/28] | Priority number, date | US19950369222 | 06.01.1995 Original published format: US 369222 | [1996/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0720941 | Date: | 10.07.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/28] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0720941 | Date: | 07.08.1996 | [1996/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0720941 | Date: | 25.08.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.06.1996 | Classification | IPC: | B61D47/00 | [1996/28] | CPC: |
B61D47/005 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1996/28] | Title | German: | Auf Eisenbahnwagen transportierbare Rampen zum Verladen von Standard-Sattelaufliegern auf, aus besonderen Einheiten zusammengestellte, Züge | [1996/28] | English: | Rail transportable ramps for circus loading standard high semi-trailers on special unit trains | [1996/28] | French: | Rampes transportables sur véhicules ferroviaires pour transborder des semi-remorques standards sur des rames composées d'unités spéciales | [1996/28] | Examination procedure | 07.02.1997 | Examination requested [1997/15] | 27.05.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.12.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.01.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.02.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.06.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 07.06.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.05.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE1145660 (BAUTZEN WAGGONBAU VEB) [X] 1 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0476180 (LINKE HOFMANN BUSCH [DE]) [X] 1 * the whole document * | by applicant | US5222443 |