EP0747152 - Video positioning system for a pouring vessel [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.05.2000 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.05.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.07.2000 [2000/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INDUCTOTHERM CORP. 10 Indel Avenue Rancocas New Jersey 08073-0157 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1996/50] | For all designated states INDUCTOTHERM CORP. 10 Indel Avenue Rancocas, New Jersey 08073-0157 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tabatabaei, Emad 12 Laurelwood Lane Eastampton, New Jersey / US | [1996/50] | Representative(s) | WP Thompson 138 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/50] | W.P. THOMPSON & CO. Eastcheap House Central Approach Letchworth, Hertfordshire SG6 3DS / GB | Application number, filing date | 95309318.4 | 20.12.1995 | [1996/50] | Priority number, date | US19950479313 | 07.06.1995 Original published format: US 479313 | [1996/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0747152 | Date: | 11.12.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0747152 | Date: | 28.07.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.10.1996 | Classification | IPC: | B22D37/00, B22D33/00, G05D3/12, B22D11/18 | [1996/50] | CPC: |
B22D33/00 (EP,US);
B22D37/00 (EP,KR,US);
B22D11/18 (EP,US);
G05B19/402 (EP,US);
G05B2219/36414 (EP,US);
G05B2219/37572 (EP,US);
G05B2219/50151 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL [1996/50] | Title | German: | Videosystem zur Positionierung einer Giesspfanne | [1996/50] | English: | Video positioning system for a pouring vessel | [1996/50] | French: | Système vidéo pour le positionnement d'une poche de coulée | [1996/50] | Examination procedure | 02.01.1996 | Examination requested [1996/50] | 31.10.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.04.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.07.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 07.01.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 26.01.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.04.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 15.04.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.04.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2918989 (GISAG VEB) [A] 1-7 * page 8 - page 11; figures 1-4; claims 1,2 *; | [X]US4724894 (SJODAHL ERIC J [US]) [X] 1-7 * column 4, line 57 - column 5, line 68; figures 1-3,5-8,11 *; | [X]DE4202020 (ABB PATENT GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-7 * column 2 - column 3; figures 1-3; claims 1-5 *; | [XP]EP0659504 (ABB PATENT GMBH [DE]) [XP] 1,7* page 3 - page 4; figures 1-4; claims 1,3,4 * |