EP0719761 - Polyalkyl and polyalkenyl aromatic amides and fuel compositions containing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.02.2000 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.02.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.03.2000 [2000/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Chevron Chemical Company LLC 575 Market Street San Francisco, CA 94105 / US | [1998/30] |
Former [1996/43] | For all designated states CHEVRON CHEMICAL COMPANY 555 Market Street San Francisco, California 94105 / US | ||
Former [1996/27] | For all designated states CHEVRON CHEMICAL COMPANY 555 Market Street San Francisco, California 94105 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cherpeck, Richard E. 8962 Cyprus Avenue Cotati, California 94931 / US | [1996/27] | Representative(s) | Nash, David Allan, et al Haseltine Lake LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/30] | Nash, David Allan, et al Haseltine Lake & Co., Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UD / GB | ||
Former [1996/27] | Nash, David Allan Haseltine Lake & Co. Hazlitt House 28 Southampton Buildings Chancery Lane London WC2A 1AT / GB | Application number, filing date | 95309405.9 | 22.12.1995 | [1996/27] | Priority number, date | US19940366528 | 30.12.1994 Original published format: US 366528 | [1996/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0719761 | Date: | 03.07.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0719761 | Date: | 11.09.1996 | [1996/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0719761 | Date: | 31.03.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.07.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C07C235/46, C07C235/50, C07C233/65, C07C233/78, C07C237/30, C07C237/44, C07C237/34, C10L1/22, C08F8/32 | [1996/27] | CPC: |
C10L1/2387 (EP,US);
C07C233/65 (EP,US);
C07C235/46 (EP,US);
C07C235/50 (EP,US);
C07C235/78 (EP,US);
C07C237/30 (EP,US);
C07C237/34 (EP,US);
C07C237/42 (EP,US);
C08F8/30 (EP,US);
C10L1/143 (EP,US);
C10L1/2383 (EP,US);
C10L10/04 (EP,US);
C10L1/1608 (EP,US);
C10L1/1616 (EP,US);
C10L1/1641 (EP,US);
C10L1/182 (EP,US);
C10L1/1852 (EP,US);
C10L1/1905 (EP,US);
C10L1/191 (EP,US);
C10L1/1985 (EP,US);
C10L1/238 (EP,US);
C10L1/305 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08F8/30, C08F10/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1996/27] | Title | German: | Polyalkyl- und Polyalkenyl-substituierte aromatische Amide und diese enthaltende Kraftstoffzusammensetzungen | [1996/27] | English: | Polyalkyl and polyalkenyl aromatic amides and fuel compositions containing the same | [1996/27] | French: | Polyalkyle et polyalkényle amides aromatiques et composition de carburant les contenant | [1996/27] | Examination procedure | 04.03.1997 | Examination requested [1997/18] | 27.03.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.07.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.10.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 09.10.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.01.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1378708 (BRITISH PETROLEUM CO) [A] 1,11-16,18-20 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0567810 (BASF AG [DE]) [A] 1,11-15,17-20 * example -; claim - *; | [A]WO9414926 (CHEVRON RES & TECH [US]) [A] 1,18-20* claim - * |