blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0719647

EP0719647 - Ink-jet apparatus employing ink-jet head having a plurality of ink ejection heaters corresponding to each ink ejection opening [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.10.2006
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip20.10.2006No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 22.11.2006  [2006/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [1996/27]For all designated states
CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Moriyama, Jiro
Canon K.K., 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
02 / Nagoshi, Shigeyasu
Canon K.K., 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
03 / Tajika, Hiroshi
Canon K.K., 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
04 / Gotoh, Fumihiro
Canon K.K., 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
05 / Kato, Masao
Canon K.K., 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
06 / Koitabashi, Noribumi
Canon K.K., 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
[1996/27]
Representative(s)Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al
Beresford Crump LLP
16 High Holborn
London WC1V 6BX / GB
[N/P]
Former [1996/27]Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al
BERESFORD & Co. 2-5 Warwick Court High Holborn
London WC1R 5DJ / GB
Application number, filing date95309502.328.12.1995
[1996/27]
Priority number, dateJP1994034026829.12.1994         Original published format: JP 34026894
JP1994034026429.12.1994         Original published format: JP 34026494
JP1994034026629.12.1994         Original published format: JP 34026694
JP1994034026729.12.1994         Original published format: JP 34026794
[1996/27]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0719647
Date:03.07.1996
Language:EN
[1996/27]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0719647
Date:07.08.1996
[1996/32]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0719647
Date:14.12.2005
Language:EN
[2005/50]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.06.1996
ClassificationIPC:B41J2/21, B41J2/165, B41J2/05
[1996/27]
CPC:
B41J19/147 (EP,US); B41J2/01 (KR); B41J2/04528 (EP,US);
B41J2/04533 (EP,US); B41J2/04551 (EP,US); B41J2/04563 (EP,US);
B41J2/04573 (EP,US); B41J2/0458 (EP,US); B41J2/04588 (EP,US);
B41J2/04591 (EP,US); B41J2/04593 (EP,US); B41J2/04598 (EP,US);
B41J2/14 (KR); B41J2/1652 (EP,US); B41J2/16526 (EP,US);
B41J2/2121 (EP,US); B41J2/2128 (EP,US); B41J2/2132 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [1996/27]
TitleGerman:Tintenstrahlkopf mit verschiedenen Heizelementen pro Düse und Tintenstrahldrucker unter Verwendung desselben[1996/27]
English:Ink-jet apparatus employing ink-jet head having a plurality of ink ejection heaters corresponding to each ink ejection opening[1996/27]
French:Tête à jet d'encre avec plusiers éléments de chauffage par buse et imprimante l'utilisant[1996/27]
Examination procedure19.12.1996Examination requested  [1997/09]
17.02.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
02.12.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.02.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
23.11.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.05.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
09.03.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.10.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
24.07.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.11.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
12.09.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.11.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
18.06.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
28.06.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.03.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.09.2005Fee for grant paid
21.09.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP04019404.5  / EP1486334
Opposition(s)15.09.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/47]
Request for further processing for:28.06.2004Request for further processing filed
28.06.2004Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
27.07.2004Decision despatched
12.09.2003Request for further processing filed
15.09.2003Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
01.10.2003Decision despatched
24.07.2002Request for further processing filed
24.07.2002Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
14.08.2002Decision despatched
09.03.2001Request for further processing filed
09.03.2001Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
05.04.2001Decision despatched
23.11.1999Request for further processing filed
23.11.1999Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
16.12.1999Decision despatched
02.12.1998Request for further processing filed
02.12.1998Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request deemed not to be filed
22.01.1999Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.12.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
24.12.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
27.12.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
21.12.2000Renewal fee patent year 06
19.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 07
19.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 08
22.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 09
20.12.2004Renewal fee patent year 10
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[XAY]US4499479  (CHEE-SHUEN LEE FRANCIS [US], et al) [X] 26,27,37,38 * column 2, line 37 - column 5, line 41; figure - * [A] 14-25,28,29,40,42 [Y] 1-4,8,11;
 [XAY]US4251824  (HARA TOSHITAMI, et al) [X] 9,12,13,37,38,40,42,44 * column 3, line 44 - column 11, line 20; figure - * [A] 1,2,4 [Y] 11;
 [YA]JPS61146556  ;
 [A]EP0496525  (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 14-25,39 * column 10, line 36 - column 14, line 34; figures 1,4,20 * * column 48, line 25 - column 49, line 11; figure 9 *;
 [A]EP0372097  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1-4,8 * column 3, line 43 - column 8, line 35; figure - *;
 [DA]JPH0531905  ;
 [DA]JPS55132259  ;
 [X]WO8703363  (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [X] 37,38 * page 3, line 34 - page 5, line 18; figure - *;
 [XA]EP0378387  (CANON KK [JP]) [X] 43 * page 3, line 45 - page 4, line 9; figures 2,3 * * page 6, line 16 - line 43 * [A] 41;
 [A]JPH023324
 [YA]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19861121), vol. 10, no. 346, Database accession no. (M - 537), & JP61146556 A 19860704 (CANON INC.) [Y] 1-4,8 * abstract * [A] 5-7
 [DA]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930616), vol. 17, no. 316, Database accession no. (M - 1430), & JP05031905 A 19930209 (CANON INC.) [DA] 9-15 * abstract *
 [DA]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19801223), vol. 4, no. 187, Database accession no. (M - 48), & JP55132259 A 19801014 (CANON INC.) [DA] 9-15 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900313), vol. 14, no. 132, Database accession no. (M - 0948), & JP2003324 A 19900108 (CANON INC.) [A] 45,46 * abstract *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.