EP0729962 - A boronic acid compound having a binaphthyl group [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.01.2002 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.01.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.03.2002 [2002/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Research Development Corporation of Japan 4-1-8, Hon-cho Kawaguchi-shi Saitama-ken 332 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1996/36] | For all designated states RESEARCH DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION OF JAPAN 4-1-8, Hon-cho Kawaguchi-shi, Saitama-ken 332 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
James, Tony 206 Rezidensu Takaishi, 1299-1 Kokubumachi Kurume-shi, Fukuoka 830 / JP | 02 /
Shinkai, Seiji 2-13-17 Mitoma Higashi-ku Fukuoka-shi, Fukuoka 811-02 / JP | 03 /
Sandanayake, Saman 307 Rokkufiru Kokubu, 568-1 Kokubumachi Kurume-shi, Fukuoka 830 / JP | [1996/36] | Representative(s) | Matthews, Derek Peter Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/36] | Matthews, Derek Peter Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 95309507.2 | 28.12.1995 | [1996/36] | Priority number, date | JP19950070638 | 03.03.1995 Original published format: JP 7063895 | [1996/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0729962 | Date: | 04.09.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0729962 | Date: | 14.03.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.06.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C07F5/02, G01N33/52 | [1996/36] | CPC: |
C07F5/025 (EP,US);
G01N33/66 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL [1996/36] | Title | German: | Borsäure-Verbindungen mit einer Binaphthyl-Gruppe | [1996/36] | English: | A boronic acid compound having a binaphthyl group | [1996/36] | French: | Composés de l'acide boronique contenant un groupe binaphthyl | [1996/36] | Examination procedure | 07.02.1997 | Examination requested [1997/15] | 17.09.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.01.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.03.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.07.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.10.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 11.10.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.12.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3720736 (SCHLEICHER ERWIN DR [DE]) [A] 1,4 * claims 1,8,13 *; | [AP]GB2284809 (JAPAN RES DEV CORP [JP]) [AP] 1 * claim 1 *; | [D]JPH0853467 (JAPAN RES DEV CORP); | [XP] - T.D. JAMES ET AL, NATURE, (19950323), vol. 374, pages 345 - 347, XP002004291 [XP] 1-7 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/374345a0 |