Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0724832
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
28.07.2000 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 13.09.2000 [2000/37] |
03.09.1999 |
Change - applicant |
published on 20.10.1999 [1999/42] |
13.08.1999 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 29.09.1999 [1999/39] |
08.07.1999 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
26.03.1999 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
26.03.1999 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
02.03.1999 |
Renewal fee |
|
27.11.1998 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
22.04.1998 |
Examination report or reply |
|
02.03.1998 |
Renewal fee |
|
17.02.1998 |
Examination report or reply |
|
10.10.1997 |
First examination report |
|
09.10.1997 |
Examination report or reply |
|
28.03.1997 |
Renewal fee |
|
31.01.1997 |
Change - applicant |
published on 19.03.1997 [1997/12] |
31.01.1997 |
Change - representative |
published on 19.03.1997 [1997/12] |
31.01.1997 |
Change - inventor |
published on 19.03.1997 [1997/12] |
22.11.1996 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 08.01.1997 [1997/02] |
21.06.1996 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 07.08.1996 [1996/32] |