EP0724832 - Properties of cats' facial pheromones [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.07.2000 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.07.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.09.2000 [2000/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fideline Le Rieu Neuf 84490 Saint Saturnin D'Apt / FR | [1999/42] |
Former [1999/39] | For all designated states FIDELINE La Fénière du Plan, Route de Saint-Saturnin 84400 Apt / FR | ||
Former [1997/12] | For all designated states FIDELINE PHEROSYNTHESE La Fénière du Plan, Route de Saint-Saturnin 84400 Apt / FR | ||
Former [1996/32] | For all designated states Pageat, Patrick 4 rue du Canal 77450 Montry / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fourcade, Jean-Claude 11, rue du Président Wilson 78800 Houilles / FR | 02 /
Pageat, Patrick La Fénière du Plan, Route de Saint-Saturnin 84400 Apt / FR | [1997/12] |
Former [1996/32] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Gutmann, Ernest, et al Ernest Gutmann - Yves Plasseraud S.A.S. 3, rue Auber 75009 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1996/32] | Gutmann, Ernest, et al Ernest Gutmann - Yves Plasseraud S.A. 3, rue Chauveau-Lagarde F-75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 95400229.1 | 03.02.1995 | [1996/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0724832 | Date: | 07.08.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0724832 | Date: | 29.09.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.08.1995 | Classification | IPC: | A01N65/00, A01N37/06, A01N37/02 | [1996/32] | CPC: |
A01N65/08 (EP,US);
A01N37/06 (EP,US);
A01N65/00 (EP,US);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/22 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP)
| C-Set: |
A01N37/06, A01N2300/00 (US,EP);
A01N37/06, A01N37/04, A01N37/02 (US,EP);
A01N65/00, A01N2300/00 (US,EP);
A01N65/00, A01N49/00, A01N37/44, A01N37/38, A01N37/06, A01N37/04, A01N37/02, A01N33/04 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1996/32] | Title | German: | Eigenschaften von Gesichtpheromonen von Katzen | [1996/32] | English: | Properties of cats' facial pheromones | [1996/32] | French: | Propriétés des phéromones faciales du chat | [1996/32] | Examination procedure | 14.11.1996 | Examination requested [1997/02] | 13.10.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.04.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.03.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.06.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 29.06.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.06.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.03.1997 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   20.03.1997 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - G. VERBERNE ET AL., "Chemo communication among domestic cats mediated by olfactory and vomero nasal senses.", BIOLOGICAL ABSTRACTS, (1977), vol. 63, Database accession no. 42504 [A] * abstract * | [D] - Z. TIERPSYCHOL., (1976), vol. 42, no. 1, pages 86 - 109 | [A] - R.D. JOHNSON ET AL., "Isolation of actinidine from Valeriana officinalis.", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (1972), vol. 76, no. 11, Database accession no. 56627w [A] * abstract * | [ ] - PHYTOCHEMISTRY, (1971), vol. 10, no. 12, pages 3334 - 3335 | [A] - K. W. VON EICKSTEDT ET AL., "Psychopharmacologic effects of valepotriates:", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (1969), vol. 70, no. 23, Database accession no. 104929w [A] * abstract * | [ ] - ARZNEIM.-FORSCH., (1969), vol. 19, no. 3, pages 316 - 319 |