EP0667677 - Device for multiplying a capacitance by a variable coefficient for adjusting a filter cut-off frequency and filter comprising same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 12.01.2001 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.01.2001 | Withdrawal of application | published on 28.02.2001 [2001/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALCATEL MOBILE COMMUNICATION FRANCE 10, rue de la Baume 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1995/33] | For all designated states ALCATEL MOBILE COMMUNICATION FRANCE 10, rue de la Baume F-75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Genest, Pierre 8, Rue A. Renoir F-95430 Butry sur Oise / FR | [1995/33] | Representative(s) | El Manouni, Josiane, et al Alcatel-Lucent International Patent Business Site Nokia Paris Saclay Route de Villejust 91620 Nozay / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1995/33] | El Manouni, Josiane, et al SOSPI 14-16, rue de la Baume F-75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 95400246.5 | 06.02.1995 | [1995/33] | Priority number, date | FR19940001454 | 09.02.1994 Original published format: FR 9401454 | [1995/33] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0667677 | Date: | 16.08.1995 | Language: | FR | [1995/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.05.1995 | Classification | IPC: | H03H11/04, H03H11/40, H03H11/48 | [1995/33] | CPC: |
H03H11/04 (EP,US);
H03H11/405 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1995/33] | Title | German: | Anordnung zur Multiplizierung einer Kapazität mit einem variierbarem Koeffizienten zur Grenzfrequenzregelung eines Filters und Filter mit einer derartigen Anordnung | [2000/45] | English: | Device for multiplying a capacitance by a variable coefficient for adjusting a filter cut-off frequency and filter comprising same | [1995/33] | French: | Dispositif de multiplication d'une capacité par un coefficient variable, notamment en vue de l'ajustement d'une fréquence de coupure d'un filtre, et filtre comportant un tel dispositif | [1995/37] |
Former [1995/33] | Anordnung zur Multiplizierung einer Kapazität mit einem variierbarem Koeffizienten zur Grenzfrequenzregulung eines Filters und Filter mit einer derartigen Anordnung | ||
Former [1995/33] | Dispositif de multiplication d'une capacité par un coéfficient variable, notamment en vue de l'ajustement d'une fréquence de coupure d'un filtre, et filtre comportant un tel dispositif | Examination procedure | 30.12.1995 | Examination requested [1996/10] | 02.03.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.09.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.10.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 21.12.2000 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2001/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]WO8102819 (MOTOROLA INC [US]) [X] 1 * page 7, line 25 - page 13, line 9 * [A] 2,3; | [A]WO9303543 (BELL COMMUNICATIONS RES [US]) [A] 1 * page 3, line 7 - page 3, line 34; figure 1 * | [A] - SITTHICHAI POOKAIYAUDOM ET AL, "EICIENT CIRCUIT IMPLEMENTATIONS OF CURRENT CONVEYORS, NEGATIVE IMPEDANCE CONVERTERS AND NONLINEAR IMPEDANCE CONVERTERS USING OPERATIONAL TRANSCONDUCTANCE AMPLIFIERS", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF ELECTRONICS, LONDON GB, vol. 64, page 941 [A] 3,7 * the whole document * |