EP0672466 - Method for adhering mineral particules on a substrate [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.11.1999 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.02.2000 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 22.03.2000 [2000/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Institut Français du Pétrole 4, Avenue de Bois Préau 92502 Rueil-Malmaison / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1999/03] | For all designated states INSTITUT FRANCAIS DU PETROLE 4, Avenue de Bois Préau 92502 Rueil-Malmaison / FR | ||
Former [1995/38] | For all designated states INSTITUT FRANCAIS DU PETROLE 4, Avenue de Bois Préau F-92502 Rueil-Malmaison / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rouaud, Thierry 34 rue Boussingault F-75013 Paris / FR | 02 /
Robin, Michel 7 avenue du Maréchal Foch F-78300 Poissy / FR | [1995/38] | Application number, filing date | 95400370.3 | 22.02.1995 | [1995/38] | Priority number, date | FR19940003249 | 17.03.1994 Original published format: FR 9403249 | [1995/38] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0672466 | Date: | 20.09.1995 | Language: | FR | [1995/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0672466 | Date: | 20.01.1999 | Language: | FR | [1999/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.04.1995 | Classification | IPC: | B05D1/00, C23C18/12 | [1995/38] | CPC: |
G01N1/36 (EP,US);
B05D1/00 (EP,US);
B05D1/12 (EP,US);
C03C17/007 (EP,US);
C23C18/1216 (EP,US);
C23C18/1254 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT, NL [1995/38] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Anbringen Mineralteilchen auf einem Substrat | [1995/38] | English: | Method for adhering mineral particules on a substrate | [1995/38] | French: | Méthode de collage de particules minérales sur des supports | [1995/38] | Examination procedure | 20.03.1996 | Examination requested [1996/20] | 10.11.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.03.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.07.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.07.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.11.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 02.11.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.10.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DE | 21.04.1999 | [2000/12] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH03295826 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920406), vol. 16, no. 133, Database accession no. (C - 0925), & JP03295826 A 00000000 (SEIKO EPSON CORP.) [A] 1 * abstract * |