EP0670505 - Inductive proximity sensor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.10.1999 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.10.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.12.1999 [1999/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC SA 40, avenue André Morizet 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1998/52] | For all designated states SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC SA 40, avenue André Morizet 92100 Boulogne Billancourt / FR | ||
Former [1995/36] | For all designated states SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC SA 40, avenue André Morizet F-92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Leonard, Didier "Les Pannetiers" F-16290 Moulinars / FR | 02 /
Guichard, Christophe 199, rue de la Grand Font F-16000 Angouleme / FR | [1995/36] | Representative(s) | Carias, Alain Schneider Electric Industries SAS Service Propriété Industrielle 89, boulevard Franklin Roosevelt 92500 Rueil Malmaison / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1995/36] | Carias, Alain Schneider Electric SA Direction Propriété Industrielle 33 bis, avenue du Maréchal Joffre F-92002 Nanterre Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 95400429.7 | 27.02.1995 | [1995/36] | Priority number, date | FR19940002623 | 04.03.1994 Original published format: FR 9402623 | [1995/36] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0670505 | Date: | 06.09.1995 | Language: | FR | [1995/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0670505 | Date: | 23.12.1998 | Language: | FR | [1998/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.04.1995 | Classification | IPC: | G01V3/10 | [1995/36] | CPC: |
G01V3/101 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, DK, GB, IT, LI [1995/36] | Title | German: | Induktive Näherungssensor | [1995/36] | English: | Inductive proximity sensor | [1995/36] | French: | Détecteur de proximité inductif | [1995/36] | Examination procedure | 04.03.1995 | Examination requested [1995/36] | 02.09.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.11.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.05.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.06.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.08.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 05.08.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.09.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE4212363 (KLAUS EBINGER ING [DE]) [X] 1 * column 4, line 8 - line 29 *; | [X]WO8606364 (GABRIEL MICROWAVE SYST [GB]) [X] 1 * page 3, line 11 - page 4, line 3 * * page 15, line 25 - line 38 *; | [A]EP0393359 (TURCK WERNER KG [DE]) [A] 1-4 * column 5, line 15 - line 41 *; | [A]EP0399563 (OMRON TATEISI ELECTRONICS CO [JP]) [A] 1-4 * column 2, line 22 - line 50 *; | [A]GB2158583 (PARKWAY INSTR CO OPERATIVE LIM) [A] 4 * abstract * |