EP0672909 - Testing device for electric connectors [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.02.2000 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.02.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.03.2000 [2000/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SM CONTACT - SARL 6, rue de Tirechappe, Ferolles F-77580 Crecy La Chapelle / FR | [1995/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Berger, Jacques 49 Chemin des Boulangers 49bis F-77860 St Germain S/Morin / FR | 02 /
Roshardt, Alain 62 Bis, rue Charles Vaillant F-77144 Chalifert / FR | [1995/38] | Representative(s) | Bonnetat, Christian Gevers France 41, avenue de Friedland 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1995/38] | Bonnetat, Christian CABINET BONNETAT 23, Rue de St. Pétersbourg F-75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 95400564.1 | 15.03.1995 | [1995/38] | Priority number, date | FR19940003314 | 18.03.1994 Original published format: FR 9403314 | [1995/38] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0672909 | Date: | 20.09.1995 | Language: | FR | [1995/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.06.1995 | Classification | IPC: | G01R31/04, G01R31/02 | [1995/38] | CPC: |
G01R31/66 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, PT [1995/38] | Title | German: | Prüfeinrichtung für elektrische Verbinder | [1995/38] | English: | Testing device for electric connectors | [1995/38] | French: | Dispositif de contrôle pour connecteurs électriques | [1995/38] | Examination procedure | 04.10.1995 | Examination requested [1995/48] | 01.10.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2000/12] | 28.10.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2000/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.1999 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]FR2592174 (RENAULT IND TOURNAISIS [BE]) [AD] 1 * abstract *; | [XD]DE3238949 (WAGNER HANS JUERGEN) [XD] 12 * page 13, line 19 - line 20; figure 5; claims 9,10 *; | [X]US4951385 (DESANTO JOSEPH J [US]) [X] 12 * column 3, line 35 - line 39; figures 2,6; claim 3 * |