EP0674921 - Modular toy device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.08.1998 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.08.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.09.1998 [1998/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WESCO 15, Avenue de la Gare F-79140 Cerizay / FR | [1995/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Vigneron, Bertrand 171, Avenue Général de Gaulle F-79140 Cerizay / FR | [1995/40] | Representative(s) | Laget, Jean-Loup Ipsilon Le Centralis 63, avenue du Général Leclerc 92340 Bourg-la-Reine / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1995/40] | Laget, Jean-Loup Cabinet Pierre Loyer 77, rue Boissière F-75116 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 95400589.8 | 17.03.1995 | [1995/40] | Priority number, date | FR19940003646 | 29.03.1994 Original published format: FR 9403646 | [1995/40] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0674921 | Date: | 04.10.1995 | Language: | FR | [1995/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0674921 | Date: | 08.10.1997 | Language: | FR | [1997/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.07.1995 | Classification | IPC: | A63B4/00, A63B26/00 | [1995/40] | CPC: |
A63B4/00 (EP);
A63B2208/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1995/40] | Title | German: | Modulartige Spielvorrichtung | [1995/40] | English: | Modular toy device | [1995/40] | French: | Dispositif de jeu modulaire | [1995/40] | Examination procedure | 24.10.1995 | Examination requested [1995/51] | 21.03.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.04.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.04.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 28.04.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.07.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3944654 (MOORE) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]DE2015649 (LOEFFLER) [A] 1 * figure -; claim 1 *; | [A]CH663543 (ROSSINELLI) [A] 1 * figure - *; | [A]US3485494 (LIEBERMAN) [A] 1 * abstract * |