EP0675651 - Method and apparatus for displaying a sequence of digital images received from a distant source [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.08.2002 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.08.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.10.2002 [2002/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALCATEL BUSINESS SYSTEMS 12, rue de la Baume F-75008 Paris / FR | For all designated states FRANCE TELECOM 6 Place d'Alleray 75015 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2001/42] | For all designated states ALCATEL BUSINESS SYSTEMS 12, rue de la Baume F-75008 Paris / FR | ||
For all designated states FRANCE TELECOM 6, Place d'Alleray 75015 Paris / FR | |||
Former [1995/40] | For all designated states ALCATEL BUSINESS SYSTEMS 12, rue de la Baume F-75008 Paris / FR | ||
For all designated states FRANCE TELECOM 6, Place d'Alleray F-75015 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Daniel, Patrick 3, Rue de la Poste F-67400 Illkirch / FR | 02 /
Szychowiak, Piotr 15, Rue Rohmer F-67400 Illkirch / FR | 03 /
Houdoin, Thierry c/o CNET Lannion, B.P. 40 F-22301 Lannion Cedex / FR | [1995/40] | Representative(s) | Schaub, Bernard, et al c/o ALCATEL ALSTHOM, Département de Propriété Industrielle, 30, avenue Kléber 75116 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1995/40] | Schaub, Bernard, et al c/o SOSPI 14-16 rue de la Baume F-75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 95400648.2 | 23.03.1995 | [1995/40] | Priority number, date | FR19940003600 | 28.03.1994 Original published format: FR 9403600 | [1995/40] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0675651 | Date: | 04.10.1995 | Language: | FR | [1995/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0675651 | Date: | 17.10.2001 | Language: | FR | [2001/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.07.1995 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/14, H04N7/60, H04N7/26, H04N7/50 | [1995/40] | CPC: |
H04N21/434 (EP,US);
H04N19/132 (EP,US);
H04N19/587 (EP,US);
H04N19/895 (EP,US);
H04N21/236 (EP,US);
H04N7/148 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1995/40] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Wiedergabe einer von einer entfernten Quelle empfangenen digitalen Bildfolge | [2000/30] | English: | Method and apparatus for displaying a sequence of digital images received from a distant source | [1995/40] | French: | Procédé et appareil de restitution d'une séquence d'images numérisées reçues d'une source distante | [1995/40] |
Former [1995/40] | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Wiedergabe einer entfernten Quelle empfangenen digitalen Bildfolge | Examination procedure | 17.02.1996 | Examination requested [1996/16] | 24.02.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.04.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.10.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.02.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.09.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.03.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.06.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 25.06.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.07.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH03211984 ; | [A]US3073896 (JAMES DENNIS B) [A] 1-4 * column 15, line 54 - column 16, line 42; figures 1,8A,8B *; | [X]US4710812 (MURAKAMI TOKUMICHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-4 * column 24, line 46 - column 26, line 58; figures 21-24 *; | [X]EP0309280 (BRITISH TELECOMM [GB]) [X] 1-4 * page 6, column 10, line 10 - line 20; figure 3; claim - *; | [A]EP0397206 (NEC CORP [JP]) [A] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0562221 (ALCATEL NV [NL], et al) [X] 1-4 * abstract *; | [A]WO9320652 (INTEL CORP [US]) [A] 1-4 * page 20, line 17 - page 22, line 20; claim - * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19911210), vol. 15, no. 486, Database accession no. (E - 1143), & JP03211984 A 19910917 (HITACHI LTD.) [A] 1-4 * abstract * |