EP0681110 - Improved nut cage [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.05.1999 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.05.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.06.1999 [1999/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RAPID S.A. 251 Boulevard Péreire F-75017 Paris / FR | [1995/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Leon, Jean-Pierre 41, Avenue du Maréchal Joffre F-78800 Houilles / FR | [1995/45] | Representative(s) | Durand, Yves Armand Louis, et al CABINET WEINSTEIN 56 A, rue du Faubourg Saint-Honoré 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1995/45] | Durand, Yves Armand Louis, et al CABINET WEINSTEIN 20, Avenue de Friedland F-75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 95400653.2 | 23.03.1995 | [1995/45] | Priority number, date | FR19940005544 | 05.05.1994 Original published format: FR 9405544 | [1995/45] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0681110 | Date: | 08.11.1995 | Language: | FR | [1995/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0681110 | Date: | 08.07.1998 | Language: | FR | [1998/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.08.1995 | Classification | IPC: | F16B37/04 | [1995/45] | CPC: |
F16B37/044 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE [1995/45] | Title | German: | Verbesserte Käfigmutter | [1995/45] | English: | Improved nut cage | [1995/45] | French: | Ecrou encagé perfectionné | [1995/45] | Examination procedure | 03.01.1996 | Examination requested [1996/10] | 11.12.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.04.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.11.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.01.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.04.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 06.04.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.04.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2613439 (I.T.W. DE FRANCE) [A] 1,2 * figure -; claim - *; | [A]FR2596473 (REGIE NATIONAL DES USINES RENAULT) [A] 1 * abstract * |