EP0676373 - Process and installation for the production of carbon monoxide [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.07.1999 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.09.1999 [1999/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L'AIR LIQUIDE, SOCIETE ANONYME POUR L'ETUDE ET L'EXPLOITATION DES PROCEDES GEORGES CLAUDE 75, Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1998/38] | For all designated states L'AIR LIQUIDE, SOCIETE ANONYME POUR L'ETUDE ET L'EXPLOITATION DES PROCEDES GEORGES CLAUDE 75, Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | ||
Former [1995/41] | For all designated states L'AIR LIQUIDE, SOCIETE ANONYME POUR L'ETUDE ET L'EXPLOITATION DES PROCEDES GEORGES CLAUDE 75, Quai d'Orsay F-75321 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Billy, Jean 33 Parc de la Lande F-94420 Le Plessis Trevise / FR | 02 /
Granier, François 12 avenue Kléber F-94130 Nogent Sur Marne / FR | [1995/41] | Representative(s) | Mercey, Fiona Susan, et al L'Air Liquide Service Brevets et Marques 75, quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1995/41] | Mercey, Fiona Susan, et al L'Air Liquide, Service Brevets et Marques, 75, quai d'Orsay F-75321 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 95400751.4 | 04.04.1995 | [1995/41] | Priority number, date | FR19940004219 | 11.04.1994 Original published format: FR 9404219 | [1995/41] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0676373 | Date: | 11.10.1995 | Language: | FR | [1995/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0676373 | Date: | 16.09.1998 | Language: | FR | [1998/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.07.1995 | Classification | IPC: | C01B31/18 | [1995/41] | CPC: |
F25J3/0285 (EP,US);
C01B3/025 (EP,US);
C01B3/506 (EP,US);
C01B32/40 (EP,US);
F25J3/0223 (EP,US);
F25J3/0261 (EP,US);
F25J3/04539 (EP,US);
F25J3/04545 (EP,US);
F25J3/04587 (EP,US);
C01B2203/046 (EP,US);
C01B2203/0465 (EP,US);
C01B2203/047 (EP,US);
C01B2203/048 (EP,US);
F25J2200/30 (EP,US);
F25J2200/72 (EP,US);
F25J2200/74 (EP,US);
F25J2200/76 (EP,US);
F25J2205/04 (EP,US);
F25J2270/02 (EP,US);
F25J2270/04 (EP,US);
F25J2270/08 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, NL [1995/41] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Anlage zur Herstellung von Kohlenmonoxyd | [1995/41] | English: | Process and installation for the production of carbon monoxide | [1995/41] | French: | Procédé et installation de production de monoxyde de carbone | [1995/41] | Examination procedure | 11.04.1996 | Examination requested [1996/23] | 17.03.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.09.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.01.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 06.02.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 25.02.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.05.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 13.05.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.06.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP0092770 (LINDE AG [DE]) [AD] 1 * claim 1 *; | [A]EP0130284 (LINDE AG [DE]) [A] 1 * claims 1,4 *; | [A]EP0313883 (LINDE AG [DE]) [A] 1 * claims 1-3 * |