EP0678240 - Thermal agricultural weed killer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.04.1999 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.04.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.05.1999 [1999/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GUILBERT EXPRESS 10-12, rue Montlouis 75011 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1995/43] | For all designated states GUILBERT EXPRESS S.A. 10-12, rue Montlouis F-75011 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Moumaneix, Francis 119, rue de Montreuil F-75011 Paris / FR | 02 /
Le Marchand, Alain 9, rue du Douaire F-95570 Villaine sous Bois / FR | 03 /
Guillou, Yves 12, rue René Salle F-77500 Chelles / FR | [1995/43] | Representative(s) | Plaçais, Jean Yves, et al Cabinet Netter 36, avenue Hoche 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1995/43] | Plaçais, Jean-Yves, et al Cabinet Netter, 40, rue Vignon F-75009 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 95400824.9 | 11.04.1995 | [1995/43] | Priority number, date | FR19940004742 | 20.04.1994 Original published format: FR 9404742 | FR19940008107 | 30.06.1994 Original published format: FR 9408107 | [1995/43] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0678240 | Date: | 25.10.1995 | Language: | FR | [1995/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.07.1995 | Classification | IPC: | A01M15/00, A01M21/04 | [1995/43] | CPC: |
A01M15/00 (EP);
A01M21/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1995/43] | Title | German: | Landwirtschaftlische thermischer Unkrautvernichter | [1995/43] | English: | Thermal agricultural weed killer | [1995/43] | French: | Désherbeur thermique agricole | [1995/43] | Examination procedure | 22.03.1996 | Examination requested [1996/21] | 03.11.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1999/20] | 22.12.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1999/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.1998 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR1506850 (URQUHART'S LIMITED) [A] 1-3,19,21 * page 1, column 2, paragraph 2 * * page 3, column 1, paragraph 8 - page 4, column 1, paragraph 3 * * figure -; claim - *; | [A]NL6511032 (A.ZWANENBURG & CO) [A] 1-3,19-23 * page 2, line 34 - page 4, line 5 * * figure -; claim - *; | [A]US2694393 (SIMPSON) [A] 1-3,19-21,23 * page 1, column 1, line 15 - line 25 * * page 1, column 1, line 63 - column 2, line 76 * * figure -; claim - *; | [A]GB2119915 (MALCOLM WHITE) [A] 1-3,23 * page 1, line 64 - page 2, line 39 * * figure -; claim - *; | [A]FR1041673 (BELLANGER) [A] 1,2,21 * page 1, column 1, paragraph 6 - column 2, paragraph 4 * * page 2, column 1, paragraph 4 - column 2, paragraph 3 * * figure -; claim - * |