EP0679783 - Device for tiltable fastening of an element [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.08.1999 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.08.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.09.1999 [1999/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RAPID S.A. 251 Boulevard Péreire F-75017 Paris / FR | [1995/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Leon, Jean-Pierre 41 Avenue du Maréchal Joffre F-78000 Houilles / FR | [1995/44] | Representative(s) | Beauchamps, Georges, et al Cabinet Weinstein 56 A, rue du Faubourg Saint-Honoré 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1997/31] | Beauchamps, Georges, et al Cabinet Weinstein 20, avenue de Friedland 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1995/44] | Beauchamps, Georges, et al Cabinet Weinstein 20, avenue de Friedland F-75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 95400884.3 | 20.04.1995 | [1995/44] | Priority number, date | FR19940005266 | 29.04.1994 Original published format: FR 9405266 | [1995/44] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0679783 | Date: | 02.11.1995 | Language: | FR | [1995/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0679783 | Date: | 30.09.1998 | Language: | FR | [1998/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.07.1995 | Classification | IPC: | E05B65/20, F16B2/20 | [1995/44] | CPC: |
E05B79/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, GB, IT, SE [1995/44] | Title | German: | Halterung zur schwenkbaren Befestigung eines Elementes | [1995/44] | English: | Device for tiltable fastening of an element | [1995/44] | French: | Attache à montage pivotant sur un élément quelconque | [1995/44] | Examination procedure | 03.01.1996 | Examination requested [1996/10] | 20.03.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.08.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.02.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 31.03.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.07.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 08.07.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.07.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO8203650 (NISSAN) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]DE3007690 (ITW) [A] 1 * the whole document * |