EP0739625 - Washing and treating composition for skin and hair based on ceramides and cationic polymers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 08.08.2008 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2008 | Revocation of patent | published on 10.09.2008 [2008/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L'Oréal 14, rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1996/44] | For all designated states L'OREAL 14, rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cauwet, Danièle 53, rue de Charonne F-75011 Paris / FR | 02 /
Dubief, Claude 9, rue Edmond Rostand F-78150 Le Chesnay / FR | 03 /
Beauquey, Bernard 40-44 rue Gaston Paymal F-92111 Clichy / FR | [1996/44] | Representative(s) | Casalonga, Axel Casalonga & Partners Bayerstrasse 73 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/44] | Casalonga, Axel BUREAU D.A. CASALONGA - JOSSE Morassistrasse 8 80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95400922.1 | 25.04.1995 | [1996/44] | Priority number, date | deleted | [1996/44] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0739625 | Date: | 30.10.1996 | Language: | FR | [1996/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0739625 | Date: | 20.06.2001 | Language: | FR | [2001/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.08.1995 | Classification | IPC: | A61K7/50, A61K7/48, A61K7/06 | [1996/44] | CPC: |
A61K8/442 (EP,US);
A61K8/46 (KR);
A61K8/64 (EP,US);
A61K8/65 (EP,US);
A61K8/68 (EP,US);
A61K8/73 (EP,US);
A61K8/731 (EP,US);
A61K8/817 (EP,US);
A61K8/84 (EP,US);
A61Q19/10 (EP,US);
A61Q5/02 (EP,US);
A61K2800/5426 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [2001/01] |
Former [1996/44] | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE | Title | German: | Haut- und Haarwaschpflegemittel auf Basis von Ceramiden und kationischen Polymeren | [2000/33] | English: | Washing and treating composition for skin and hair based on ceramides and cationic polymers | [1996/44] | French: | Compositions pour le lavage et le traitement des cheveux et de la peau à base de céramide et de polymères à groupement cationiques | [1996/44] |
Former [1996/44] | Haut- und Haarwaschpflegemittel auf Basis von Ceramiden und kationischen Polymere | Examination procedure | 26.07.1995 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Priority | 04.08.1995 | Examination requested [1996/44] | 14.09.1995 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Priority 01 | 30.08.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.11.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.12.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 19.12.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
19.03.2002
ADMISSIBLE Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien VTP/Patente Henkelstrasse 67 40191 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/19] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
19.03.2002
ADMISSIBLE Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien VTP/Patente Henkelstrasse 67 40191 Düsseldorf / DE | 24.04.2002 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 04.11.2002 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 02.12.2003 | Date of oral proceedings | 30.01.2004 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 16.05.2006 | Date of oral proceedings | 20.06.2006 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 20.06.2006 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 30.06.2008 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2008/37] | 30.06.2008 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Appeal following opposition | 28.08.2006 | Appeal received No. T1249/06 | 30.10.2006 | Statement of grounds filed | 30.06.2008 | Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent | 08.08.2006 | Appeal received No. T1249/06 | 30.06.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 07.07.2008 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]EP0278505 (ESTEE LAUDER INC [US]) [DA] 1-23* the whole document *; | [DA]WO9302656 (OREAL [FR]) [DA] 1-23 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9403151 (UNILEVER PLC [GB], et al) [A] 1-23 * the whole document * |