EP0683379 - System for making 3-D measurements of the surfaces of a large object [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1995/47] | System for making 3-D measurements of the surfaces of large objects | ||
[1999/21] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.03.2000 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.03.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.05.2000 [2000/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SOLLAC (Société Anonyme) Immeuble Pacific, 11/13, Cours Valmy, La Défense 92070 La Défense / FR | For all designated states BERTIN & CIE SOCIETE ANONYME 59, rue Pierre Curie F-78370 Plaisir / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1995/47] | For all designated states SOLLAC (Société Anonyme) Immeuble Pacific, 11/13, Cours Valmy, La Défense F-92070 La Défense / FR | ||
For all designated states BERTIN & CIE SOCIETE ANONYME 59, rue Pierre Curie F-78370 Plaisir / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Maillart, Jean-Luc, Henri, Raoul 601, Domaine de la salle F-13320 Bouc Bel Air / FR | 02 /
Lequime, Michel 6, rue des Souries F-13510 Eguilles / FR | 03 /
Bellamy, Pascale 8 rond point de Malgeneste F-60300 Senlis / FR | 04 /
De Smet, Gabriel 30 Boulevard du lac F-95880 Enghien les Bains / FR | [1995/47] | Representative(s) | Gevers & Orès Immeuble le Palatin 2 3 Cours du Triangle CS 80165 92939 Paris La Défense Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1995/47] | Cabinet Martinet & Lapoux BP 405 F-78055 Saint Quentin en Yvelines Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 95401125.0 | 16.05.1995 | [1995/47] | Priority number, date | FR19940006238 | 19.05.1994 Original published format: FR 9406238 | [1995/47] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0683379 | Date: | 22.11.1995 | Language: | FR | [1995/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.08.1995 | Classification | IPC: | G01B11/24 | [1995/47] | CPC: |
G01B11/2518 (EP,US);
G01B21/20 (KR);
Y10S367/907 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1995/47] | Title | German: | System zur drei-dimensionalen Messung der Oberfläche eines grö eren Objekts | [1999/21] | English: | System for making 3-D measurements of the surfaces of a large object | [1999/21] | French: | Mesure tridimensionnelle de la surface d'un objet de grande dimension | [1995/47] |
Former [1995/47] | System zur drei-dimensionalen Messung der Oberfläche von grössen Objekten | ||
Former [1995/47] | System for making 3-D measurements of the surfaces of large objects | Examination procedure | 04.12.1995 | Examination requested [1996/05] | 11.09.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.10.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.04.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.07.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.11.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2000/18] | 01.12.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2000/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH0618253 ; | [YA]WO8601897 (SHORT BROTHERS PLC [IE]) [Y] 1 * page 8, line 31 - page 16, line 2; figures 1-3 * [A] 2,5; | [A]EP0489641 (COMMISSARIAT ENERGIE ATOMIQUE [FR]) [A] 1,6,8,11,12* page 4, line 10 - line 31; figure 2; claim 1 *; | [YA]WO9308448 (ELECTRO OPTICAL INFORMATION SY [US]) [Y] 1 * page 14, line 13 - page 17, line 18; figure 1 * [A] 11,12 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940418), vol. 18, no. 216, Database accession no. (P - 1728), & JP06018253 A 19940125 (FUJITA CORP.) [A] 3,8-10 * abstract * | by applicant | FR2664377 |