Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0686796
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
17.07.1998 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 02.09.1998 [1998/36] |
20.02.1998 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.04.1998 [1998/15] |
25.07.1997 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 10.09.1997 [1997/37] |
07.06.1997 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
03.05.1997 |
Renewal fee |
|
07.03.1997 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
07.02.1997 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
07.02.1997 |
First examination report |
|
27.10.1995 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 13.12.1995 [1995/50] |
27.10.1995 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 13.12.1995 [1995/50] |